Williams v. Baptist Community Health Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Trenika Williams
Defendant: Baptist Community Health Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00384
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT - This case is hereby remanded to the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, Louisiana. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(sbs)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is "Amended Notice of Removal.' Clerk took corrective action by modifying the docket text.** (sbs)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Baptist Community Health Services, Inc. (Lemmon, Jeanne) Modified event and text on 1/29/2019 (sbs).
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - The Preliminary Conference currently scheduled for February 19, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED. A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 19, 2019 AT 10:30 A.M. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant file an amended notice of removal establishing the basis for its assertion that this Court has jurisdiction in the instant matter by no later than Monday, January 28, 2019, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 9:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (sbs)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Lemmon, Jeanne) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/22/2019) (sbs).
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **All CM/ECF documents created via word-processing software should be saved as PDF files, not printed to hard copy and scanned. Within 3 working days, filing counsel is to provide the Court with a corrected version of their filing. The corrected version should be emailed to efile-morgan@laed.uscourts.gov. Within the email, filing counsel should include the case caption and document number the corrected version is in relation to. Please do not file the corrected version onto the record. For further information regarding which documents should or should not be scanned and filed onto the record, please visit http://www.laed.uscourts.gov/news/all-cmecf-documents-should-be-saved-pdf-files-and-not-printed-hard-copy-and-scanned** (sbs)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/18/19.(sbs)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2018-11486 I-14(Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7370026) filed by Baptist Community Health Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Verification, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 Certificate - U.S. Dept of Health, #5 State Court Notice of Removal)Attorney Jeanne Roslyn Lemmon added to party Baptist Community Health Service, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lemmon, Jeanne) Modified text on 1/18/2019 (sbs). (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/23/2019) (tsf). Modified on 1/23/2019 (tsf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Baptist Community Health Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Community Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeanne Roslyn Lemmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trenika Williams
Represented By: John Eric Bicknell, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua L. Holmes
Represented By: Jennifer Jon Greene
Represented By: Samuel J. Ford
Represented By: David Paul Vicknair
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?