St. Bernard Parish v. Entergy Louisiana, LLC et al
Plaintiff: St. Bernard Parish
Defendant: ENTERGY LOUISIANA, LLC, Entergy Lousiana Holding, Inc., Atmos Energy Corporation and Union Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00459
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY in Support filed by St. Bernard Parish re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ajn)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/21/2019. (ajn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition by St. Bernard Parish. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Madigan, Thomas) Modified text on 3/21/2019 (mmm).
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Atmos Energy Corporation re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Habig, Matthew)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE regarding oral argument re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . By Clerk.(jrc)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by St. Bernard Parish regarding #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Madigan, Thomas)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by St. Bernard Parish. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A)(Madigan, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Compliance by Atmos Energy Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Local Rule 3.2 Filing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of All Parties Remaining, #2 State Court Pleadings All Pleadings, Orders and Service)(Habig, Matthew) Modified text on 2/4/2019 to correct event (ajn).
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (gk)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Atmos Energy Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent of Defendants. (Habig, Matthew)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 34th JDC St. Bernard Parish, case number 18-1032 Div. "A" (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7376560) filed by Atmos Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Matthew Turney Habig added to party Atmos Energy Corporation(pty:dft).(Habig, Matthew) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (ajn). (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/28/2019) (ajn). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2019: #2 State Court Documents) (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Bernard Parish v. Entergy Louisiana, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENTERGY LOUISIANA, LLC
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Sean D. Moore
Represented By: Andy Joseph Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Lousiana Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Sean D. Moore
Represented By: Andy Joseph Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atmos Energy Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Turney Habig
Represented By: James K. Ordeneaux
Represented By: Godfrey Bruce Parkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Bernard Parish
Represented By: Michael C Ginart, Jr.
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Nicholas N.S. Cusimano
Represented By: Joyce D. Young
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?