Owens v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Leonard Owens, Jr.
Defendant: United States of America
Undetermined: The United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00485
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by United States of America. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)Attorney Mary Katherine Kaufman added to party United States of America(pty:dft).(Kaufman, Mary Katherine)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sbs)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (gk)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7379810) filed by Leonard Owens, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Scott Hubert Fruge added to party Leonard Owens, Jr(pty:pla).(Fruge, Scott) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Owens, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Hubert Fruge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Mary Katherine Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?