Moran v. Foremost Maritime Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Troy Moran, Jr.
Defendant: Foremost Maritime Company, LLC, Associated Terminals LLC, M/V KANG MAY, Foremost (Ship) Management Company, LLC, Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC and Kang May M/V
Case Number: 2:2019cv00642
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jay C. Zainey: The Court held a Telephone Conference on 9/17/2020. The Court set the conference at the request of counsel. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall reopen this case and restore it to the active trial docket. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a 2 day Bench Trial set for Tuesday, 3/23/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Pretrial Conference set for Thursday, 2/25/2021 at 10:15 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Counsel shall prepare in accordance with the previously-issued pretrial notice (Rec. Doc. 16-1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for the parties shall contact the assigned Magistrate Judge for the purpose of scheduling a settlement conference, said conference to take place no later than 12/31/2020. (ajn)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Status Conference set for 9/17/2020 10:45 AM by telephone before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/2/20.(jrc)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying #52 Motion to Reopen Case and for Status Conference because it is premature. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/1/2020. (ajn)
April 30, 2020 Filing 52 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Reopen Case and for Status Conference by Troy Moran, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Piacun, Joseph)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall administratively close this matter pending further orders of the Court. The Court shall retain jurisdiction and the case shall be restored to the trial docket upon motion of a party once circumstances change, so that it may proceed to final disposition. This order shall not prejudice the rights of the parties to this litigation. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 2/27/2020.(ajn)
January 30, 2020 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jay C. Zainey: A Telephone Conference was held on 1/30/2020. The Court convened the conference to discuss with counsel issues related to Defendants' key witness's anticipated arrival from China. IT IS ORDERED that the nonjury trial scheduled to commence on Monday, 2/3/2020 is CANCELLED pending further orders of the Court. (ajn)
January 30, 2020 Filing 49 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Troy Moran, Jr. (Piacun, Joseph)
January 30, 2020 Filing 48 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Foremost Maritime Company, LLC, Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC. (Tompkins, Peter)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RULING ON OBJECTIONS TO TRIAL EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey.(jrc)
January 24, 2020 Filing 46 OBJECTIONS by Foremost Maritime Company, LLC, Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC to Plaintiff's Trial Exhibits (Tompkins, Peter)
January 22, 2020 Filing 44 STIPULATION by Foremost Maritime Company, LLC and By Plaintiff, Troy Moran (Tompkins, Peter)
January 22, 2020 Filing 43 Witness List by Foremost Maritime Company, LLC. (Tompkins, Peter) Modified text on 1/23/2020 (ajn).
January 22, 2020 Filing 42 Witness List by Troy Moran, Jr. (Piacun, Joseph) Modified text on 1/23/2020 (ajn).
January 22, 2020 Filing 41 ***FILED IN ERROR - CORRECTED AT REC. DOC. 42** Witness List by Troy Moran, Jr. (Piacun, Joseph) Modified text on 1/23/2020 (ajn).
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 1/17/2020.(ajn)
January 16, 2020 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held 1/16/20 before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/16/2020, denyding #35 MOTION to Continue Trial, denying as moot #36 MOTION to Expedite. 3 day bench trial set 2/3/20 10:00 AM. (jrc)
January 14, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Troy Moran, Jr re #35 MOTION to Continue Trial, #36 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Continue Trial . (Piacun, Joseph)
January 14, 2020 Filing 38 Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by Troy Moran, Jr (Piacun, Joseph) Modified text on 1/15/2020 (ajn).
January 14, 2020 Filing 37 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #35 MOTION to Continue Trial. ***Filing attorney should have selected 'No' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/ConsentMotion Y/N? Motions that are set for submission are not Exparte. Clerk has removed 'Exparte' set motion for submission on 2/5/2020. No further action is necessary.*** (ajn)
January 13, 2020 Filing 36 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Motion to Continue Trial by Foremost Maritime Company, LLC, Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walsh, Tarryn)
January 13, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Continue Trial by Foremost Maritime Company, LLC, Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Walsh, Tarryn) Modified text on 1/14/2020 to add submission date and remove 'Exparte' (ajn).
January 9, 2020 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld: A Settlement Conference was held on 1/9/2020. Following settlement discussions, the parties were unable to negotiate a settlement of the case at this time. Further negotiations will proceed telephonically. (ajn)
December 23, 2019 Filing 33 JOINT STIPULATIONS by Foremost Maritime Company, LLC, Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC, Troy Moran (Tompkins, Peter)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Associated Terminals LLC. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 11/26/19.(jrc)
November 26, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Associated Terminals LLC re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (ajn)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #29 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 11/26/2019. (ajn)
November 25, 2019 Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Associated Terminals LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(DuBose, Emmitt)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #27 Motion to Enroll as Co-Counsel of Record, Attorney Reid Scott Uzee for Troy Moran, Jr. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 11/21/2019. (ajn)
November 20, 2019 Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record Reid S. Uzee by Troy Moran, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Piacun, Joseph) Modified text on 11/21/2019 (clw).
November 19, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Foremost Maritime Company, LLC, Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Tompkins, Peter)
November 15, 2019 Filing 25 Witness and Exhibit List by Associated Terminals LLC. (DuBose, Emmitt)
November 15, 2019 Filing 24 Witness and Exhibit List by Foremost Maritime Company, LLC, Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC, Kang May M/V. (Tompkins, Peter)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A Settlement Conference set for Thursday, 1/9/2020 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. PLEASE BE PUNCTUAL. The required settlement memoranda, as set forth herein, are due no later than midnight on Thursday, 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 11/15/2019.(ajn)
November 15, 2019 Filing 22 Witness and Exhibit List by Troy Moran, Jr. (Piacun, Joseph)
November 12, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Associated Terminals LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D)(DuBose, Emmitt)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to exchange expert reports is extended until 11/6/19. FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants to exchange expert reports is extended until 12/6/19. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/18/19. (ko)
October 17, 2019 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Troy Moran, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Piacun, Joseph)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Partial Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on May 22, 2019. (mp)
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Partial by Troy Moran, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Piacun, Joseph) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (mp).
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Bench Trial set for 2/3/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey.. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jrc)
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Associated Terminals LLC (DuBose, Emmitt)
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Foremost Maritime Company, LLC, Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC by Associated Terminals LLC.(DuBose, Emmitt)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2019 9:50 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foremost Maritime Company, LLC, Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC (Tompkins, Peter)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Foremost Maritime Company, LLC, Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC.Attorney Peter B. Tompkins added to party Foremost Maritime Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Peter B. Tompkins added to party Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC(pty:dft).(Tompkins, Peter)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 2/26/19. (jrc)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Piacun, Joseph)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Foremost Maritime Company, LLC served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (Piacun, Joseph)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Associated Terminals LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Frederick William Swaim, III added to party Associated Terminals LLC(pty:dft).(Swaim, Frederick)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Associated Terminals LLC served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Piacun, Joseph)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Associated Terminals LLC, Foremost Maritime Company, LLC, Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jeg)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Summons Submitted for Issuance. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Piacun, Joseph) (Main Document 3 and Attachments 1-2 replaced on 1/29/2019) (jeg). Modified text on 1/29/2019 (jeg).
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gk)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Associated Terminals LLC, Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC, Foremost Maritime Company, LLC, Kang May M/V (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7387935) filed by Troy Moran, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Joseph S. Piacun added to party Troy Moran, Jr(pty:pla).(Piacun, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moran v. Foremost Maritime Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Moran, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph S. Piacun
Represented By: Leonard Joseph Cline, Jr.
Represented By: Reid Scott Uzee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Maritime Company, LLC
Represented By: Peter B. Tompkins
Represented By: Tarryn Elizabeth Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Terminals LLC
Represented By: Frederick William Swaim, III
Represented By: Emmitt L. DuBose, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V KANG MAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost (Ship) Management Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Ship Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Peter B. Tompkins
Represented By: Tarryn Elizabeth Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kang May M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?