Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans v. Nordbay Shipping CV et al

Plaintiff: Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans
Defendant: Nordbay Shipping CV, Reederei Nord BV, Swedish Club and Nordbay M/T
Undetermined: The Swedish Club and Reederie Nord B.V.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00821
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 , #5 , & #6 Waivers of Service Executed. Filing attorney entered the incorrect waiver sent date. Waivers sent to Nordbay Shipping CV, Swedish Club, and Reederei Nord BV on 2/1/2019. Answers are due 4/2/2019. (sa)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Swedish Club on 2/1/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Sanderson, Adam) Modified waiver date on 3/18/2019 (sa).
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Nordbay Shipping CV on 2/1/2019/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Sanderson, Adam) Modified waiver date on 3/18/2019 (sa).
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Reederei Nord BV on 2/1/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Sanderson, Adam) Modified waiver date on 3/18/2019 (sa).
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nordbay Shipping CV, Reederei Nord BV, Swedish Club. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sa)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7400442) filed by Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) Attorney Adam P. Sanderson added to party Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans(pty:plf).(Sanderson, Adam) Modified text on 2/4/2019 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans v. Nordbay Shipping CV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: The Swedish Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Reederie Nord B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordbay Shipping CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reederei Nord BV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swedish Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordbay M/T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans
Represented By: Adam P. Sanderson
Represented By: Andre J. Mouledoux
Represented By: Darryl Harrison
Represented By: Trevor Matthew Cutaiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?