Bertuccelli et al v. Universal City Studios LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan Bertuccelli and Studio 3, Inc.
Defendant: unidentified parties, Blumhouse Productions, LLC, Tree Falls in the Woods, L.L.C., Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, Universal City Studios LLC, Anthony Robert Gardner, Tony Robert Gardner, Alterian Ghost Factory, Inc and Trick or Treat Studios
Case Number: 2:2019cv01304
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc)
March 27, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Alterian Ghost Factory, Inc served on 3/23/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Scialdone, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Anthony Robert Gardner served on 3/23/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Scialdone, John)
March 26, 2019 Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File re: #15 First Amended Complaint Responsive Pleadings by Blumhouse Productions, LLC, Tree Falls in the Woods, L.L.C., Trick or Treat Studios, Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roy, Mary Ellen) Modified text on 3/27/2019 to link documents (ajn).
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric M. Stahl.. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Pro Hace Vice Counsel) (ajn)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kelli L. Sager. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Pro Hac Vice Counsel) (ajn)
March 21, 2019 Filing 26 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric M. Stahl (Fee previously paid) by Blumhouse Productions, LLC, Tree Falls in the Woods, L.L.C., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Roy, Mary Ellen)
March 20, 2019 Filing 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kelli L. Sager (Fee previously paid) by Blumhouse Productions, LLC, Tree Falls in the Woods, L.L.C., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Pleading)(Roy, Mary Ellen) Modified text on 3/21/2019 (mmm).
March 14, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Trick or Treat Studios served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019. (Scialdone, John)
March 14, 2019 Filing 23 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric M. Stahl (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7480819) by Blumhouse Productions, LLC, Tree Falls in the Woods, L.L.C., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Roy, Mary Ellen) Modified on 3/15/2019 (mp).
March 14, 2019 Filing 22 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kelli L. Sager (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7480741) by Blumhouse Productions, LLC, Tree Falls in the Woods, L.L.C., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Roy, Mary Ellen) Modified on 3/15/2019 (mp).
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/8/19. (jrc)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/8/19. (jrc)
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, #15 First Amended Complaint by Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Mary Ellen Roy added to party Universal City Studios LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Ellen Roy added to party Universal City Studios Productions LLLP(pty:dft).(Roy, Mary Ellen) Modified text on 3/8/2019 to correct links (ajn).
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, #15 First Amended Complaint by Blumhouse Productions, LLC, Tree Falls in the Woods, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Mary Ellen Roy added to party Blumhouse Productions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Ellen Roy added to party Tree Falls in the Woods, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Roy, Mary Ellen) Modified text on 3/8/2019 to correct links(ajn).
March 4, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Alterian Ghost Factory, Inc, Anthony Robert Gardner, Trick or Treat Studios. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(am)
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons The Alterian Ghost Factory, Inc., #2 Summons Trick or Treat Studios, Inc.)(Scialdone, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Blumhouse Productions, LLC, Tree Falls in the Woods, L.L.C., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, unidentified parties, Anthony "Tony" Robert Gardner, The Alterian Ghost Factory, Inc., Trick or Treat Studios filed by Jonathan Bertuccelli, Studio 3, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - KCB Copyright, #2 Exhibit 2 - WWNO.ORG article, #3 Exhibit 3 - Work began 09.19.16, #4 Exhibit 4 - Twitter 2017-18, #5 Exhibit 5 - Tigerdroppings.com, #6 Exhibit 6 - Reddit Blog, #7 Exhibit 7 - Belly Up Sports, #8 Exhibit 8 - Twitter 2019, #9 Exhibit 9 - Teaser One Sheet, #10 Exhibit 10 - Assignment Agmt,, #11 Exhibit 11 - HDD Copyright)(Scialdone, John)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William O. Luckett, Jr. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 2/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Pro Hac Vice Counsel) (ajn)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (William O. Luckett) (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7436036) by Jonathan Bertuccelli, Studio 3, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of William O. Luckett, #3 Exhibit C - ECF Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Scialdone, John)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Neil Harris, Jr. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Pro Hac Vice Counsel) (ajn)
February 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Tree Falls in the Woods, L.L.C. served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Scialdone, John)
February 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Blumhouse Productions, LLC served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Scialdone, John)
February 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Universal City Studios Productions LLLP served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Scialdone, John)
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Universal City Studios LLC served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Scialdone, John)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record, Attorney John Steven Garner for Jonathan Bertuccelli and Studio 3, Inc. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 2/14/2019. (ajn)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Blumhouse Productions, LLC, Tree Falls in the Woods, L.L.C., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ajn)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (David N. Harris, Jr.) (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7427450) by Jonathan Bertuccelli, Studio 3, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of David N. Harris, Jr., #3 Exhibit C - ECF Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Scialdone, John)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record (John S. Garner) by Jonathan Bertuccelli, Studio 3, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scialdone, John)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, #2 Summons Universal City Studios Productions LLLP (2), #3 Summons Blumhouse Productions, LLC, #4 Summons Tree Falls in the Woods, L.L.C.)(Scialdone, John)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Blumhouse Productions, LLC, Tree Falls in the Woods, L.L.C., Universal City Studios LLC, Universal City Studios Productions LLLP, unidentified parties (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7424735) filed by Jonathan Bertuccelli, Studio 3, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - KCB Copyright, #2 Exhibit 2 - WWNO.ORG article, #3 Exhibit 3 - Work began 09.19.16, #4 Exhibit 4 - Twitter 2017-18, #5 Exhibit 5 - Tigerdroppings.com, #6 Exhibit 6 - Reddit Blog, #7 Exhibit 7 - Belly Up Sports, #8 Exhibit 8 - Twitter 2019, #9 Exhibit 9 - Teaser One Sheet, #10 Exhibit 10 - Assignment Agmt, #11 Exhibit 11 - HDD Copyright, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney John A. Scialdone added to party Jonathan Bertuccelli(pty:pla), Attorney John A. Scialdone added to party Studio 3, Inc.(pty:pla).(Scialdone, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2019: #13 Copyright AO 121 form) (ajn). (Attachment 13 replaced on 2/14/2019) (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bertuccelli et al v. Universal City Studios LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Bertuccelli
Represented By: John A. Scialdone
Represented By: William O. Luckett, Jr.
Represented By: David Neil Harris, Jr.
Represented By: John Steven Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Studio 3, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Scialdone
Represented By: William O. Luckett, Jr.
Represented By: David Neil Harris, Jr.
Represented By: John Steven Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: unidentified parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blumhouse Productions, LLC
Represented By: Eric M. Stahl
Represented By: Kelli L. Sager
Represented By: Dan Brian Zimmerman
Represented By: Mary Ellen Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tree Falls in the Woods, L.L.C.
Represented By: Eric M. Stahl
Represented By: Kelli L. Sager
Represented By: Dan Brian Zimmerman
Represented By: Mary Ellen Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal City Studios Productions LLLP
Represented By: Eric M. Stahl
Represented By: Kelli L. Sager
Represented By: Dan Brian Zimmerman
Represented By: Mary Ellen Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal City Studios LLC
Represented By: Eric M. Stahl
Represented By: Kelli L. Sager
Represented By: Dan Brian Zimmerman
Represented By: Mary Ellen Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Robert Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Robert Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alterian Ghost Factory, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trick or Treat Studios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?