Thompson et al v. Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Shameka Thompson and JaJuan Davis
Defendant: JKL, Inc., GHI, Inc., QRS Insurance Company, NOP Insurance Company, HIJ Insurance Company, TUV Insurance Company, DEF, Inc., EFG Insurance Company, BO-MAC Contractors, Ltd., ABC, Inc., Shell Oil Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, XYZ Insurance Company, Shell Chemical, LP, Safe Harbor Access Systems, LLC, KLM Insurance Company, Unidentified Parties and Safe Harbor Access Systems II, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01636
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #21 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. **All CM/ECF documents created via word-processing software should be saved as PDF files, not printed to hard copy and scanned.** (sbs) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (sbs).
April 16, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd. re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Colletta, Katharine) Modified on 4/16/2019 (sbs).
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - Due to a conflict in this Court's calendar, the status conference previously scheduled at 10:00 a.m. on 5/8/2019 is HEREBY RESET at 3:00 P.M. on 5/8/2019. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/9/19.(sbs)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - A status conference is scheduled in this case on 5/8/2019 at 10:00 A.M. in Judge Africk's chambers. Parties to comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/2/19.(sbs)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/8/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 7/1/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Jury Trial set for 9/16/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF:Magistrate Judge)(sbs)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #15 Request/Statement of Oral Argument as to the #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court; the Court declines to schedule oral argument at this time. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/26/19.(sbs)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court. **Filing attorney attached a Request/Statement for Oral Argument to this motion instead of filing it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the request and docketing it as a separate entry. All future requests for oral argument must be filed separately. ALSO, name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary.** (sbs)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by JaJuan Davis, Shameka Thompson regarding #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (sbs)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by JaJuan Davis, Shameka Thompson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit, #4 Request for Oral Argument)(Markey, Jason) Modified on 3/25/2019 (sbs).
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 Answer to Complaint. **Filing attorney should have linked the Answer to the Notice of Removal. Clerk properly linked documents. No further action necessary.** (sbs)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2019 10:45 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (blg)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand, by Safe Harbor Access Systems II, LLC.(Maselli, Joseph) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (sbs).
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Zurich American Insurance Company. Attorney Thear J. Lemoine added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Lemoine, Thear)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Royal Dutch Shell PLC as a Corporate Parent. Clerk took corrective action by adding the Corporate Parent.** (sbs)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Shell Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell PLC for (Colletta, Katharine) Modified text on 3/8/2019 (sbs).
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Affirmative Defenses, and Defenses by Shell Chemical, LP, Shell Oil Company.(Colletta, Katharine)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Affirmative Defenses, and Defenses by Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd.(Colletta, Katharine) Modified on 3/1/2019 (sbs).
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney incorrectly linked the Notice of Compliance to the Court's directive. Clerk properly linked the Notice of Compliance to the Notice of Removal.** (sbs)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd., Shell Chemical, LP, Shell Oil Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Returns on Service of Process, #3 29th JDC Docket)(Colletta, Katharine) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (sbs).
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd. By the Clerk.(sbs)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 29th JDC, Parish of St. Charles, case number 85,620 C (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7442479) filed by Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Katharine Rachael Colletta added to party Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd.(pty:dft).(Colletta, Katharine) Modified text on 2/22/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson et al v. Bo-Mac Contractors, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JKL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QRS Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOP Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIJ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TUV Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EFG Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BO-MAC Contractors, Ltd.
Represented By: Katharine Rachael Colletta
Represented By: Adelaida J. Ferchmin
Represented By: John Francis Olinde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Katharine Rachael Colletta
Represented By: Adelaida J. Ferchmin
Represented By: John Francis Olinde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Thear J. Lemoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Chemical, LP
Represented By: Katharine Rachael Colletta
Represented By: Adelaida J. Ferchmin
Represented By: John Francis Olinde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe Harbor Access Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLM Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe Harbor Access Systems II, LLC
Represented By: Conrad C Rolling
Represented By: Joseph Maselli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameka Thompson
Represented By: Leo Joseph Palazzo
Represented By: Mario A. Arteaga
Represented By: Jason J. Markey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JaJuan Davis
Represented By: Leo Joseph Palazzo
Represented By: Mario A. Arteaga
Represented By: Jason J. Markey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?