Cerberus, L.L.C. et al v. Caruso et al

Plaintiff: Raymond L. Russo, Jr., Cerberus, L.L.C., Justin Bonura and Rocky Russo
Defendant: Mele Printing, L.L.C., Professional Insurance Agents of Louisiana, Incorporated, Lamar Company, LLC, Kingfish Communications LLC, New Orleans Publishing Group, L.L.C., Nola Messenger, L.L.C., Westmoreland Publishing Company, Inc., Surplus Line Reporter Incorporated, Moran Printing, Inc., Louisiana Construction and Industry Association, Louisiana Business, Inc., Thrive, L.L.C., Agent C, L.L.C., Specht Newspapers, Inc., E&M Consulting, Inc., Independent Insurance Agents & Brokers of Louisiana, Inc., Renaissance Publishing LLC, David Caruso, M and L Publishing Company, Inc., Louisiana Associated General Contractors, Inc., Abbott Enterprises, L.L.C., Redbird Publishing, L.L.C. and M & L Publishing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01692
Filed: February 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to The Lamar Company, L.L.C. by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Louisiana Business, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Kingfish Communications LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Thrive, L.L.C. by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Nola Messenger, L.L.C. by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to The Surplus Line Reporter Incorporated by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Professional Insurance Agents of Louisiana, Incorporated by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Independent Insurance Agents & Brokers of Louisiana, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to M and L Publishing, L.L.C. by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Westmoreland Publishing Company, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to New Orleans Publishing Group, L.L.C. by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Redbird Publishing, L.L.C. by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Specht Newspapers, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Renaissance Publiching LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Mele Printing, L.L.C. by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to E&M Consulting, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Moran Printing, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Abbott Enterprises, L.L.C. by All Plaintiffs. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Dismissal without prejudice as to Louisiana Associated General Contractors, Inc. by All Plaintiffs (Lilly, Andrew) Modified text on 4/4/2019 (sa).
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Surplus Line Reporter Incorporated on 3/16/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Lilly, Andrew)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Kingfish Communications LLC on 3/16/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Lilly, Andrew)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Renaissance Publishing LLC on 3/16/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Lilly, Andrew)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Mele Printing, L.L.C. on 3/16/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Lilly, Andrew)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Louisiana Construction and Industry Association answer due 4/10/2019. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 3/20/2019. (ecm)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Louisiana Construction and Industry Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney J. Wendell Clark added to party Louisiana Construction and Industry Association(pty:dft).(Clark, J.) Modified text/link on 3/20/2019 (sa). .
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Louisiana Construction and Industry Association served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Lilly, Andrew)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to David Caruso on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Lilly, Andrew)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Agent C, L.L.C. on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Lilly, Andrew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Agent C, L.L.C., David Caruso, and Louisiana Construction and Industry Association. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sa)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Lilly, Andrew)
February 24, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Cerberus, L.L.C. (Lilly, Andrew)
February 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7444886) filed by Raymond ("Rocky") L. Russo, Cerberus, L.L.C., Justin Bonura. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)Attorney Andrew T. Lilly added to party Justin Bonura(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew T. Lilly added to party Cerberus, L.L.C. (pty:pla), Attorney Andrew T. Lilly added to party Raymond ("Rocky") L. Russo(pty:pla).(Lilly, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cerberus, L.L.C. et al v. Caruso et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mele Printing, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Insurance Agents of Louisiana, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingfish Communications LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans Publishing Group, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nola Messenger, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westmoreland Publishing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surplus Line Reporter Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moran Printing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Construction and Industry Association
Represented By: J. Wendell Clark
Represented By: Joseph W. Clark
Represented By: Mark L. Barbre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Business, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrive, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agent C, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specht Newspapers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E&M Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Insurance Agents & Brokers of Louisiana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renaissance Publishing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M and L Publishing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Associated General Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Enterprises, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redbird Publishing, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & L Publishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond L. Russo, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew T. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cerberus, L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew T. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Bonura
Represented By: Andrew T. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Russo
Represented By: Andrew T. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?