Clark v. Huntington Ingalls Industries, et al.

Plaintiff: Willie M. Clark and Willie M Clark
Defendant: J.D. Roberts, Uniroyal, Inc., McCarty Corporation, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Taylor Seidenbach, Inc., Maryland Casualty Company, Eagle, Inc., CBS Corporation, Lamorak Insurance Company, International Paper Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Wayne Manufacturing Company, Inc., Viacom Inc., John David Roberts, Reilly-Benton Company, Inc., James Melton Garrett, Uniroyal Holding, Inc., OneBeacon America Insurance Company and Zurich American Insurance Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: J. Melton Garrett, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated and Albert L. Bossier, Jr.
3Rd Party Defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Foster Wheeler, LLC, Claims Resolution Management Corporation and Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01709
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #7 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Inc, with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company (As successor by merger to Maryland Casualty Company as an alleged insurer of Marquette Insulations, Inc.)(Devenport, Marc) Modified text on 4/5/2019 (sa).
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited for Lamorak Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Burg, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, and Cross-Claims of J. Melton Garrett and Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal, Inc.(pty:dft).(Arthur, Mary) Modified text/link on 3/22/2019 (sa).
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Claims Resolution Management Corporation, Foster Wheeler, LLC, and Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CROSSCLAIM against CBS Corporation, Eagle, Inc, Hopeman Brothers Inc., International Paper Co., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Maryland Casualty Company, The McCarty Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Taylor-Seidenbach, and Uniroyal, Inc., by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Shockey, Patrick) Modified on 3/22/2019 (sa).
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Notice of Compliance. **Notice of Compliance should have been linked to the Notice of Removal and not the Court's directive. Clerk took corrective action by modifying the link. Also, filing attorney submitted exhibits on legal sized paper. All documents filed in this Court must be on 8 1/2" by 11" paper. Clerk took corrective action by reducing the documents. Reducing the documents increased the file size, therefore Clerk had to separate the documents into smaller page numbers. Clerk replaced documents. No further action necessary.** (sbs)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., J. Melton Garrett, Lamorak Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 State Court Pleadings)(Trapolin, Edward) Modified text and link on 3/13/2019 (sbs). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/13/2019) (sbs). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/13/2019) (sbs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2019: #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 State Court Pleadings) (sbs).
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Cross-Claims of J. Melton Garrett and Albert L. Bossier, Jr., with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company. Attorney Marc E. Devenport added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:dft/crd).(Devenport, Marc) Modified text on 3/11/2019 (sa).
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Lamorak Insurance Company, J. Melton Garrett. Issued by Clerk. (sa)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2018-11429 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7446035) filed by J. Melton Garrett, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company, Albert L. Bossier, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:crc), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:3pp), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party J. Melton Garrett(pty:3pp), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party J. Melton Garrett(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party J. Melton Garrett(pty:crc).(Trapolin, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Huntington Ingalls Industries, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: J. Melton Garrett
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Jasmine Najee Brown
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Patrick Kevin Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Albert L. Bossier, Jr.
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Seidenbach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John David Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Melton Garrett
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Frances M. Montegut
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Louise Maccherone
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Marc E. Devenport
Represented By: Lee M. LeBouef
Represented By: Edward T. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie M. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie M Clark
Represented By: Ron Anthony Austin
Represented By: Jevan Smoot Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?