Burk Property Investments, LLC v. Illinois Union Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Burk Property Investments, LLC and Burk Property Investments, L.L.C.
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01787
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2020 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Bench Trial set for 5/11/2020 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Issued by Clerk for Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 4/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form, #2 Standing Order)(jrc)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2019 2:30 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Answer to Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Illinois Union Insurance Company.(Engelhardt, Leah) Modified linkage on 3/28/2019 (mm).
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance by Illinois Union Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Engelhardt, Leah) Modified linkage on 3/12/2019 (mm).
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petition for Damages as to Illinois Union Insurance Company answer due 3/27/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/4/19. (sbs)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company. By the Clerk. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(mm)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Petition for Damages by Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Engelhardt, Leah)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (gk)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 18-10863 E-16 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7451306) filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleading, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Leah Nunn Engelhardt added to party Illinois Union Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Engelhardt, Leah) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burk Property Investments, LLC v. Illinois Union Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Leah Nunn Engelhardt
Represented By: Thomas H. Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burk Property Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burk Property Investments, L.L.C.
Represented By: John A. Venezia
Represented By: Julie Elizabeth O'Shesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?