John Carroll Investigations, LLC v. D&A Enterprises Inc.
Plaintiff: John Carroll Investigations, LLC
Defendant: D&A Enterprises Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01973
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice as to D&A Enterprises Inc. by John Carroll Investigations, LLC. (Almon, Matthew)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL - In accordance with 28:455, the undersigned hereby disqualifies himself from handling this matter; Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court reallot this matter to another Section of this Court. Judge Barry W Ashe recused. Case reassigned to Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/7/2019. (NEF: Section L)(sa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by D&A Enterprises Inc. Issued by Clerk. (sa)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by D&A Enterprises Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal Notice to State Court of Removal)(McGoey, Thomas)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (McGoey, Thomas)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th JDC Jefferson Parish, case number 791647 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7458771) filed by D&A Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Attorney Thomas J. McGoey, II added to party D&A Enterprises Inc.(pty:dft).(McGoey, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Carroll Investigations, LLC v. D&A Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&A Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. McGoey, II
Represented By: A'Dair Ragan Flynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Carroll Investigations, LLC
Represented By: Peter Michael Thomson
Represented By: Matthew S. Almon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?