Walker v. University of Louisiana System Board of Supervisors et al
Plaintiff: Natalie Walker
Defendant: Shawn Vincent, George Budwell, University of Louisiana System Board of Supervisors Through University of New Orleans and University of Louisiana System Board of Supervisors
Case Number: 2:2019cv02527
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Docket Call set for 7/17/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (kac)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Response/Reply.**1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action by changing the text. 2. Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 4. Clerk properly linked document to document 1.** (am) Modified text on 3/29/2019 (am).
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by University of Louisiana Sysmtem Board of Supervisors to #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Phayer, Dennis) Modified text/linkage on 3/26/2019 (am).
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, by Clerk. (am) Modified text to remove filers/correct signature on 3/27/2019 (jls).
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by University of Louisiana System Board of Supervisors.(Phayer, Dennis) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (am).
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2018-10673 G(11) (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7491136) filed by University of Louisiana System Board of Supervisors Through University of New Orleans. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Dennis J. Phayer added to party University of Louisiana System Board of Supervisors Through University of New Orleans(pty:dft), (Phayer, Dennis) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (am). Modified filers and assoc counsel on 3/27/2019 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. University of Louisiana System Board of Supervisors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Vincent
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Budwell
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Louisiana System Board of Supervisors Through University of New Orleans
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Louisiana System Board of Supervisors
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Gregory C. Fahrenholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Walker
Represented By: Hester R. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?