Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Fulton on Tap, LLC et al

Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Sloopy II Inc., Boy Meets Girl Music, Unichappell Music Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Da Crippler Publishing, EMI Consortium Songs Inc., Carl Perkins Music, Inc., Rick's Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, Gibb Brothers Music, Soar Loser Music, Red Sea Songs, EWC Publishing Co. and Collipark Music
Defendant: Shawn Breaud, Kyle Roberts, NOLA Grind, LLC, Fulton on Tap, LLC, Shane Songy and NOLA Grind
Case Number: 2:2019cv02681
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Bench Trial set for 1/27/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. All discovery must be completed by 12/10/2019. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(kac)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 09:00 AM before case manager by telephone. All parties are to call into the conference call at the number listed on the notice. By Clerk. (kac)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Answer to Complaint.**Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1.** (am)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Shawn Breaud, NOLA Grind, LLC, Kyle Roberts, Shane Songy.(Morris, Sheri) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (am).
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Fulton on Tap, LLC.(Morris, Sheri) Modified text/linkage on 6/18/2019 (am).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their responsive pleadings no later than 06/17/2019. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 05/30/2019. (am)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fulton on Tap LLC, Nola Grind LLC, Shane Songy, Shawn Breaud, Kyle Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Sheri M. Morris added to party Fulton on Tap, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sheri M. Morris added to party Nola Grind LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sheri M. Morris added to party Shane Songy(pty:dft), Attorney Sheri M. Morris added to party Kyle Roberts(pty:dft), Attorney Sheri M. Morris added to party Shawn Breaud(pty:dft).(Morris, Sheri) Modified text on 5/29/2019 (am).
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Shawn Breaud served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019; Fulton on Tap, LLC served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019; NOLA Grind, LLC served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019; Kyle Roberts served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019; Shane Songy served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019. (Balkin, Mark)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Shawn Breaud, Fulton on Tap, LLC, NOLA Grind, L.L.C, Kyle Roberts, Shane Songy. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(am)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carl Perkins Music, Inc., Collipark Music, Crompton Songs, Da Crippler Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs Inc., EWC Publishing Co., Gibb Brothers Music, Red Sea Songs, Rick's Music, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Sloopy II Inc., Soar Loser Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Unichappell Music Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Unichappell Music Inc.; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Rondor Music International, Inc.; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs Inc. ; Corporate Parent Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. for Rick's Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC (Balkin, Mark)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7494812) filed by Crompton Songs, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, EWC Publishing Co., Carl Perkins Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Da Crippler Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Boy Meets Girl Music, Rick's Music, Inc., Sloopy II Inc., EMI Consortium Songs Inc., Collipark Music, Soar Loser Music, Unichappell Music Inc., Red Sea Songs, Gibb Brothers Music, Rondor Music International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)Attorney Mark A. Balkin added to party Boy Meets Girl Music(pty:pla), Broadcast Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Carl Perkins Music, Inc.(pty:pla),Collipark Music(pty:pla), Crompton Songs(pty:pla),Da Crippler Publishing(pty:pla),EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.(pty:pla), EMI Consortium Songs Inc. (pty:pla), EWC Publishing Co.(pty:pla), Gibb Brothers Music(pty:pla), Red Sea Songs(pty:pla), Rick's Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Rondor Music International, Inc.(pty:pla), Sloopy II Inc.(pty:pla), Soar Loser Music(pty:pla), Sony/ATV Songs LLC(pty:pla), Unichappell Music Inc.(pty:pla).(Balkin, Mark) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (am). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2019: #7 AO Form 121) (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Fulton on Tap, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Breaud
Represented By: Sheri M. Morris
Represented By: Donald Stephen Brouillette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Roberts
Represented By: Sheri M. Morris
Represented By: Donald Stephen Brouillette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOLA Grind, LLC
Represented By: Sheri M. Morris
Represented By: Donald Stephen Brouillette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton on Tap, LLC
Represented By: Sheri M. Morris
Represented By: Donald Stephen Brouillette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Songy
Represented By: Sheri M. Morris
Represented By: Donald Stephen Brouillette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOLA Grind
Represented By: Sheri M. Morris
Represented By: Donald Stephen Brouillette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sloopy II Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boy Meets Girl Music
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Da Crippler Publishing
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Perkins Music, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick's Music, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crompton Songs
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibb Brothers Music
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soar Loser Music
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Sea Songs
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EWC Publishing Co.
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collipark Music
Represented By: Mark A. Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?