Singleton v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Lionel Singleton, Jr.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02684
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
3 Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Substitute Attorney Sandra Sears in place of Brock Dupre for USA. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States of America.Attorney Sandra Lee Sears added to party United States of America(pty:dft).(Sears, Sandra) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (clw).
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Sandra Lee Sears to be substituted in place of Brock D Dupre by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dupre, Brock) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (clw).
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Sandra Lee Sears to be substituted in place of Brock D Dupre by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dupre, Brock) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (mp).
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 **FILED IN ERROR - SEE CORRECTION REC. DOC. 12** EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Sandra Lee Sears to be substituted in place of Brock D Dupre by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dupre, Brock) Modified on 6/17/2019 (ajn).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2019 10:45 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Bench Trial set for 1/6/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey.. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/28/19. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jrc)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to United States of America. Answer due 6/18/2019. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on May 28, 2019. (mp)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dupre, Brock) Modified text on 5/28/2019 (mp).
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2019 2:20 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - IT IS ORDERED that this matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to Section "A"(3), in accordance with Rule 3.1.1E. Case transferred to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/5/2019. (NEF: Section A, Mag. 3)(sa)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case(s) by United States of America of related case(s) 18-5075. Attorney Brock Darren Dupre added to party United States of America(pty:dft).(Dupre, Brock) Modified on 4/8/2019 (sa). (NEF: Sections A & H)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sbs)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Complaint filed by attorney was incomplete. Complete Complaint subsequently provided to clerk. Clerk replaced the incomplete Complaint with the completed copy provided by attorney. No further action necessary.** (sbs)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7494905) filed by Lionel Singleton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Willard P. Schieffler added to party Lionel Singleton, Jr(pty:pla).(Schieffler, Willard) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/22/2019) (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Brock Darren Dupre
Represented By: Sandra Lee Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Singleton, Jr.
Represented By: Willard P. Schieffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?