Stockstill et al v. Minnesota Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Edward Stockstill, Theresa Stockstill, Theresa A. Stockstill and Edward R. Stockstill, Sr.
Defendant: Regions Bank, Minnesota Life Insurance Company and Financial Services Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv03520
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. IT IS ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference of this matter presently scheduled for July 11, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby continued and reset for the 17th day of July, 2019, at 9:00 oclock a.m. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 7/8/2019. (mmv)
June 26, 2019 Filing 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Edward R. Stockstill, Sr, Theresa A. Stockstill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ippolito, Frank)
June 26, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference reset for 7/11/2019 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (mmv)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/13/2019. (jeg)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. On June 3, 2019, Chief Judge Brown ordered the transfer of 15 civil cases from this section, section "J" to be reallotted to Judge Wendy Vitter, Section "D" of this Court. Three of those cases cannot be transferred, however, due to a conflict. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases herein be transferred to Section "D". Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Carl Barbier no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/10/2019.(cg)
May 31, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2019 02:30 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (gec)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Financial Services Association dismissed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #19 Motion is GRANTED, and Defendant Financial Services Association (also referred to as Financial Services Associates) is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 5/23/2019. (mm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party by Financial Services Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Conrad, Richard)
May 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Financial Services Association. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Minnesota Life Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ltr to Mr. Stockstill, 5/29/18, #3 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #4 Notice of Submission Notice of Submission)(Conrad, Richard) Modified on 5/6/2019 (gec).
May 1, 2019 Filing 17 *FILED IN ERROR__SEE REC DOC. 18--MEMORANDUM filed by Financial Services Association re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Party Financial Services Association . (Conrad, Richard) Modified on 5/1/2019 (cg).
May 1, 2019 Filing 16 *FILED IN ERROR--SEE REC DOC. 18 MOTION to Dismiss Party Financial Services Association by Financial Services Association. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Minnesota Life Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ltr to Mr. Stockstill, 5/29/18)(Conrad, Richard) Modified on 5/1/2019 (cg).
May 1, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Minnesota Life Insurance Company.(Conrad, Richard)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Financial Services Association answer due 5/3/2019. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/26/2019. (cg)
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed Motion) by Financial Services Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Richard Tracy Conrad, III added to party Financial Services Association(pty:dft).(Conrad, Richard)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kelly D. Simpkins. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/23/2019. (cg)
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to #1 Complaint by Regions Bank.(Conrad, Richard) Modified text on 4/23/2019 (cg).
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kelly D. Simpkins (Filing fee $100 receipt number 053L-7585177) by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of KDS, #3 Exhibit C - KDS Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Conrad, Richard) Modified text on 4/22/2019 (sbs).
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 DEFICIENT: NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Tracy Conrad, III on behalf of Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Regions Bank. Attorney Richard Tracy Conrad, III added to party Minnesota Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Tracy Conrad, III added to party Regions Bank(pty:dft).(Conrad, Richard) Modified on 4/18/2019 (cg).
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Regions Bank served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Correspondence / Delivery Receipt)(Ippolito, Frank)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Minnesota Life Insurance Company served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Correspondence / Delivery Receipt)(Ippolito, Frank)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Financial Services Association served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Correspondence / Delivery Receipt)(Ippolito, Frank)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Financial Services Association, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cg)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Financial Services Association, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Regions Bank filed by Edward R. Stockstill, Sr, Theresa A. Stockstill re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Ippolito, Frank)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Please resubmit the summons to be issued. The summons provided with the complaint are blank. When using the summons form, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print (save) the document to pdf format. (cg)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (djg)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Edward Stockstill, Theresa Stockstill (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7508398) filed by Edward Stockstill, Theresa Stockstill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Frank Dean Ippolito added to party Edward Stockstill(pty:pla), Attorney Frank Dean Ippolito added to party Theresa Stockstill(pty:pla).(Ippolito, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stockstill et al v. Minnesota Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Stockstill
Represented By: Frank Dean Ippolito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Stockstill
Represented By: Frank Dean Ippolito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa A. Stockstill
Represented By: Frank Dean Ippolito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward R. Stockstill, Sr.
Represented By: Frank Dean Ippolito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Represented By: Kelly D. Simpkins
Represented By: Richard Tracy Conrad, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly D. Simpkins
Represented By: Richard Tracy Conrad, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Services Association
Represented By: Kelly D. Simpkins
Represented By: Richard Tracy Conrad, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?