Fontana v. New Orleans City et al
Plaintiff: Luke Fontana and Save Our Wetlands, Inc.
Defendant: Barry Schechter, Anthony Bakewell, New Orleans City, Michael Harrison, Shaun Ferguson, Sidney Jackson, LaToya Cantrell and Sidney Jackson, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09120
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
2 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Barry W Ashe no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/27/2019.(sa)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The City has until the 15th day of July, 2019 in which to file responsive pleadings to plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 6/25/2019. (sa)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by New Orleans City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Mark Daniel Macnamara added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft).(Macnamara, Mark) Modified text/filers on 6/25/2019 (sa).
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Anthony Bakewell on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Hamilton, Bruce)
May 14, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Sidney Jackson, Jr on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Hamilton, Bruce)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Barry Schechter on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Hamilton, Bruce)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Shaun Ferguson on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Hamilton, Bruce)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Michael Harrison on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Hamilton, Bruce)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to New Orleans City on 4/23/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Hamilton, Bruce)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to LaToya Cantrell on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Hamilton, Bruce)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 *FILED IN ERROR, Re-filed at Doc. 9* WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to New Orleans City on 4/30/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Hamilton, Bruce) Modified on 5/15/2019 (sa).
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Luke Fontana, Save Our Wetlands.Attorney Bruce W. Hamilton added to party Save Our Wetlands(pty:pla).(Hamilton, Bruce)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent Agreement by All Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Consent Agreement)(Schwartzmann, Katharine) Modified on 4/11/2019 (kac).
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Anthony Bakewell, LaToya Cantrell, Shaun Ferguson, Michael Harrison, Sidney Jackson, Jr, New Orleans City, Barry Schechter. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(sa)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hamilton, Bruce) Modified text on 4/9/2019 (sa).
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7552482) filed by Luke Fontana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) Attorney Bruce W. Hamilton added to party Luke Fontana(pty:pla).(Hamilton, Bruce) (Attachment 1 flattened & replaced on 4/9/2019) (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontana v. New Orleans City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Bakewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Churita H. Hansell
Represented By: Donesia Diane Turner
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Represented By: Sunni Jones LeBeouf
Represented By: Mark Daniel Macnamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaToya Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney Jackson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Fontana
Represented By: Bruce W. Hamilton
Represented By: Katharine Murphy Schwartzmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Save Our Wetlands, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce W. Hamilton
Represented By: Katharine Murphy Schwartzmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?