Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund v. Afaxys, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund and Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
Defendant: Afaxys, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09171
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE regarding oral argument re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue, MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1406(a) filed by Afaxys, Inc. By Clerk.(mmv)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Afaxys, Inc. regarding #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue and Alternatively, MOTION to Transfer. (Currault, Donna) Modified text on 6/12/2019 (mm).
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue and Alternatively, MOTION to Transfer. by Afaxys, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Notice of Submission)(Currault, Donna) Modified text on 6/12/2019 (mm).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/3/2019.(mm)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Margaret D. Hall for Defendant Afaxys, Inc. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 05/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Margaret "Peg" Donahue Hall (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7660363) by Afaxys, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Donna Phillips Currault added to party Afaxys, Inc.(pty:dft).(Currault, Donna) Modified text on 5/23/2019 (jeg).
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Afaxys, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(clc)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Request for Summons Issued. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdfformat. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (clc)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Afaxys, Inc. filed by The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Summons to registered agent, #2 Summons to counsel)(Breaux, Marie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/11/2019) (clc). (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/11/2019) (clc).
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
April 10, 2019 Filing fee received from Breaux, Marie:receipt 053L-7557168$ 400.00 (cc)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Afaxys, Inc. (Fee previously paid) filed by Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Marie Breaux added to party The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund(pty:pla).(Breaux, Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund v. Afaxys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
Represented By: Marie Breaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
Represented By: Marjorie Ruth Esman
Represented By: Marie Breaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Afaxys, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret D. Hall
Represented By: Ewell E. Eagan, Jr.
Represented By: Donna Phillips Currault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?