Phoenix Insurance Company v. Louisiana Sugar Refining, LLC

Plaintiff: The Phoenix Insurance Company and Phoenix Insurance Company
Defendant: Louisiana Sugar Refining, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv09187
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: ORDERED that on or before JULY 15, 2019, plaintiffs shall file into the record the returns of service of process that have been effected on defendants. Failure to do so will result in the DISMISSAL of the unserved defendants without further notice. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 6/24/2019.(clc)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Phoenix Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp. for Phoenix Insurance Company (Guichet, Joseph) Modified text on 5/15/2019 (sa).
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Louisiana Sugar Refining, LLC. (sa)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Louisiana Sugar Refining, LLC filed by Phoenix Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. (Guichet, Joseph) (Main Document 3 flattened & replaced image on 4/29/2019) (sa). Modified text on 4/29/2019 (sa).
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (gk)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louisiana Sugar Refining, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7557782) filed by Phoenix Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Joseph Pierre Guichet added to party Phoenix Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Guichet, Joseph) (Attachment 1 flattened & replaced on 4/10/2019) (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phoenix Insurance Company v. Louisiana Sugar Refining, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Sugar Refining, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Pierre Guichet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Pierre Guichet
Represented By: Jay P. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?