Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange

Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange
Case Number: 2:2019cv09230
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
3 Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter AJK Holdings, LLC as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Atain Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AJK Holdings, LLC for Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Truitt, Jack) Modified text/corporate parents on 7/2/2019 (mm).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/27/2019.(am) (Main Document 13 replaced on 6/27/2019) (lag).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Bench Trial set for 4/27/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. All discovery must be completed by 3/10/2020. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(kac)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange (Krouse, Allen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 09:45 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (kac)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment by Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange.(Krouse, Allen)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. My son-in-law, T. Patrick OLeary, is a partner of the Frilot, L.L.C. firm, which represents the defendant in this matter. Accordingly, I am required to recuse myself from this matter. Judicial Conference of the United States, Committee on Codes of Conduct, Advisory Opinion No. 58 (Aug. 9, 1978, revised July 10, 1998) (citing Canon 3C(1)(d)(ii) and (iii)). The Clerk of Court is directed to reallot this matter to another Magistrate Judge Division of this court. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/8/2019.(mmv) (NEF: J. Lemelle, MJ Roby, Case Mgr)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Movant is granted an extension of 20 days from the date responsive pleadings were originally due in which to file responsive pleadings to the complaint against it. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 05/06/2019. (am)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Allen Joseph Krouse, III added to party Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange(pty:dft).(Krouse, Allen) Modified text on 5/6/2019 (am). Modified text on 5/8/2019 (am).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Judge Sarah S. Vance, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/11/2019.(mm)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. (mm)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7559631) filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Jack Etherton Truitt added to party Atain Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Truitt, Jack) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/10/2019) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange
Represented By: Allen Joseph Krouse, III
Represented By: Suzanne Marie Risey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nancy N. Butcher
Represented By: Lou Anne Milliman
Represented By: Jack Etherton Truitt
Represented By: Thomas Jeffrey Adair
Represented By: Michelle Mayne Davis
Represented By: Peter Martin Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?