Cougle v. Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America, et al

Plaintiff: M.D. Allan Gougle and Allan G Cougle
Defendant: Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America, Ameritas Life Insurance Corp. and Ameritas Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv09257
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America re #10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. (mm)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/3/2019. (mm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #19 MOTION for Leave to File. **Filing attorney did not select category 'Proposed Pleading' when attaching document for which leave to file is being requested. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Complaint re: rec. doc. 10 by Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(O'Brien, Juston) Modified text on 7/2/2019 (mm).
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Ameritas Life Insurance Corp. re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (mm)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/21/2019. (mm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum re: rec. doc. 12 by Ameritas Life Insurance Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Foster, Darryl)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/19 is reset to be held on 7/25/2019 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/20/19.(jjs)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Allan G Cougle re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), #10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. (Anderson, Ernest) Modified text on 6/13/2019 (mm).
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 DEFICIENT: RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Allan G Cougle re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Anderson, Ernest) Modified text on 6/6/2019 (mm).
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Ameritas Life Insurance Corp. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Foster, Darryl) Modified text on 5/8/2019 (mm).
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION to Dismiss. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/12(b)(6). Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit)(O'Brien, Juston) Modified event on 5/8/2019 (mm).
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(O'Brien, Juston) Modified text on 5/7/2019 (mm).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Scheduling Conference reset from 6/6/19 to 6/20/2019 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/16/19.(jjs)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2019 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/16/19.(jjs)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. IT IS ORDERED that Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America's Motion is GRANTED and Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America shall be given an extension of 21 days through and including May 8, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise plead in response to the plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/16/2019. (mm)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead. **Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Notice of Removal by Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Juston) Modified linkage on 4/15/2019 (mm).
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Attachments had duplicate descriptions. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (djg)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial District Court, case number 19-11314 E(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7561808) filed by Ameritas Life Insurance Corp., Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) Attorney Juston M. O'Brien added to party Ameritas Life Insurance Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Juston M. O'Brien added to party Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft).(O'Brien, Juston) Modified text on 4/11/2019 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cougle v. Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. Allan Gougle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan G Cougle
Represented By: Ernest S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Juston M. O'Brien
Represented By: Rachal Danielle Cox
Represented By: Rodolfo J. Aguilar, Jr.
Represented By: Ronnie L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameritas Life Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Juston M. O'Brien
Represented By: Joseph Lawrence Shea, Jr.
Represented By: John B. Stanton
Represented By: Darryl J. Foster
Represented By: Katherine S Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameritas Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?