Norton v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Catherine Norton
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv09307
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Summons Returned Executed. Filing attorney added incorrect services dates. Clerk took corrective action to reset the dates as follows: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 4/19/2019, answer due 6/18/2019 (sa)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Return receipts indicating service of summonses have now been filed in the record. Record Doc. No. #5 . Accordingly, the call docket scheduled for today is SATISFIED, and no appearances are necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/10/2019.(mmv)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 4/19/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meunier, Adam) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (sa).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: You are hereby notified that the captioned case will be called on 7/10/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson Jr. Counsel for plaintiff must appear IN PERSON and report on the status of the case and show cause why service of the summons and complaint has not been completed. If service is completed before 7/10/2019, filing the appropriate service returns in the record will satisfy this order and make an appearance unnecessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 6/18/2019.(ajn)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(clc)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (djg)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7564159) filed by Catherine Norton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Melanie Anne Leavitt added to party Catherine Norton(pty:pla).(Leavitt, Melanie) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (clc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norton v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Norton
Represented By: Melanie Anne Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?