CRC Distributing, LLC v. Phil's Cakebox Bakeries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CRC Distributing, LLC
Defendant: Phil's Cakebox Bakeries, Inc. and Phil Alessi, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09324
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
2 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 Amended Complaint, as to Phil Alessi, Jr and Phil's Cakebox Bakeries, Inc. answer due 7/30/2019. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/10/2019. (blg)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint. **1. Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 10. Clerk properly linked document. 2. Attachment had duplicate description. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #10 Amended Complaint by Phil Alessi, Jr, Phil's Cakebox Bakeries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Stephen G. Bullock added to party Phil Alessi, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen G. Bullock added to party Phil's Cakebox Bakeries, Inc.(pty:dft).(Bullock, Stephen) Modified linkage/text on 7/5/2019 (mm).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Lance M Africk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/27/2019.(blg)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Amended Complaint. **Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section I, Judge Lance M. Africk, and Magistrate 2, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr.** (jls)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by CRC Distributing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Schmidt, F.) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (jls).
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CRC Distributing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cross Road Holdings, LLC for CRC Distributing, LLC (Schmidt, F.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Phil Alessi, Jr on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Schmidt, F.)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Phil's Cakebox Bakeries, Inc. on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Schmidt, F.)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul M. Quin. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/1/19. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul M. Quin (Filing fee $100 receipt number 053L-7609509) by CRC Distributing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 E-File Registration, #4 Proposed Order)(Schmidt, F.) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (sbs).
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James Frazier Carraway. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/15/19. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice J. Frazier Carraway (Filing fee $100 receipt number 053L-7567819) by CRC Distributing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 ECF Registration, #4 Proposed Order)(Schmidt, F.) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (sbs).
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7567742) filed by CRC Distributing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)Attorney F. Evans Schmidt added to party CRC Distributing, LLC(pty:pla).(Schmidt, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRC Distributing, LLC v. Phil's Cakebox Bakeries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil's Cakebox Bakeries, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew S. Almon
Represented By: Stephen G. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Alessi, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew S. Almon
Represented By: Stephen G. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRC Distributing, LLC
Represented By: F. Evans Schmidt
Represented By: Paul M. Quin
Represented By: James Frazier Carraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?