Ricard. v. Plaquemines Parish Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Jeffery D. Ricard, Jr. and Jeffery D Ricard, Jr
Defendant: Plaquemines Parish Detention Center and Plaquemines Parish Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 2:2019cv09327
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's #12 Motion to Amend his Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/28/2019. (mmv)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Jeffery D Ricard, Jr. (mmv)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Jeffery D. Ricard, Jr's claims against Defendants the Plaquemines Parish Detention Center and the Plaquemines Parish Sheriff's Office are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and/or for failing to state a claim on which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) (2)(B). Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/19/2019.(mm)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff Jeffery D. Ricard, Jr's claims against Defendants the Plaquemines Parish Detention Center and the Plaquemines Parish Sheriff's Office are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and/or for failing to state a claim on which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/19/2019.(mm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint. RECOMMENDED that plaintiffs federal civil rights complaint seeking relief under 42 U.S.C. 1983 be dismissed as frivolous and/or for failing to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Objections to R&R due by 6/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 5/20/2019. (NEF: Sect G)(caa)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $6.00 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Jeffery D. Ricard, Jr. in monthly payments as set out in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is DIRECTED to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 5/9/2019. (cc: Warden)(ajn)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffery D Ricard, Jr. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (Attachments: #1 deficient doc 2)(mmv)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 5/7/2019. (clc)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00078. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (clc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/19/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mmv).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/11/2019. (KAH) [Transferred from lamd on 4/15/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffery D. Ricard, Jr. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 4/15/2019.]
February 4, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 4/15/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jeffery D. Ricard, Jr.. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 4/15/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Plaquemines Parish Detention Center, Plaquemines Parish Sheriff Office, filed by Jeffery D. Ricard, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 4/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricard. v. Plaquemines Parish Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaquemines Parish Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaquemines Parish Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery D. Ricard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery D Ricard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?