Claiborne et al v. Hudson Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Williams and Tynisha Claiborne
Defendant: Willie Green, Hudson Insurance Company and Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09333
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the telephone status conference set for Thursday, August 8, 2019, at 8:30 a.m. is RESET for Thursday, August 8, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. This conference shall be in person. Only out-of-town counsel may attend by telephone. Further, counsel are instructed to bring their calendars with them. Not later than two days preceding the status conference, all parties shall fax (504-589-2643) or otherwise deliver to the Court and to all other counsel, or may file into the record, a short letter explaining the status of the case and any issues the Court will need to address at the conference. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/8/2019.(mm)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Eldon E. Fallon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/27/2019.(jeg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: A Status Conference was held on 6/20/2019. The parties discussed the status of the case. ORDERED that the parties participate in a telephone status conference with the Court on Thursday, August 8, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. The Court will initiate the call. (jeg)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record.John J. Elmer, Jr. shall be enrolled as counsel of record for Plaintiffs, and the designation of lead attorney shall be removed from Edward J. Womac, Jr. and Christopher Williamson shall be designated as lead attorney for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/22/2019. (jeg)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record and Designate Lead Attorney by Tynisha Claiborne, Anthony Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney John J. Elmer added to party Tynisha Claiborne(pty:pla), Attorney John J. Elmer added to party Anthony Williams(pty:pla).(Elmer, John)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Status Conference set for 6/20/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Jury Trial set for 12/16/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 11/4/2019. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/14/19. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(dno)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2019 at 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (dno)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Odyssey Reinsurance Company, Odyssey Re Holdings Corp., Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited as corporate parents at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action. (mm)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Answer to Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance List of Parties and State Court Record by Willie Green, Hudson Insurance Company, Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Potts, Kyle) Modified text/linkage on 4/19/2019 (mm).
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc. (Potts, Kyle)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hudson Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parents Odyssey Reinsurance Company, Odyssey Re Holdings Corp., Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited for Hudson Insurance Company. (Potts, Kyle) Modified text/corporate Parents on 4/19/2019 (mm).
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Willie Green, Hudson Insurance Company, Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc. (Potts, Kyle) Modified text/linkage on 4/19/2019 (mm).
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE of the Court pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Willie Green, Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc., Hudson Insurance Company. By the Clerk.(jeg)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (sek)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-02111 Div A Sec 16 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7568785) filed by Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc., Hudson Insurance Company, Willie Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit- State Court Pleading, #3 Exhibit, #4 Certificate of Filing)Attorney Edwin Christian Laizer added to party Willie Green(pty:dft), Attorney Edwin Christian Laizer added to party Hudson Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Edwin Christian Laizer added to party Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc.(pty:dft).(Laizer, Edwin) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Claiborne et al v. Hudson Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Williams
Represented By: John J. Elmer
Represented By: Edward J. Womac, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher James Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tynisha Claiborne
Represented By: John J. Elmer
Represented By: Edward J. Womac, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher James Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Green
Represented By: Edwin Christian Laizer
Represented By: Kyle Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Company
Represented By: Edwin Christian Laizer
Represented By: Kyle Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Edwin Christian Laizer
Represented By: Kyle Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?