Marsh v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, et al
Plaintiff: Harry Marsh
Defendant: LGS Technologies, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Warren Pumps LLC, Foster Wheeler Corporation, Bexar Canyon Management, Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, BP Production North America, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Certain-Teed Corporation, A.W. Chesterson Company, Hopeman Brothers Inc, Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc., Crane Company, National Bulk Carriers, Inc, Texaco Inc, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Grefco Inc., Crescent Materials Service Inc, Chiquita Brands International, Maryland Casualty Company, CBS Corporation, McCarty Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company Inc., IDEX Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Bayer CropScience, Inc., John Crane Inc, General Electric Company, Chevron USA Inc, Triplex Inc., Anco Insulations Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Charles Johnson, Owens Illinois, Inc, Isbrandtsen Company, CSR Limited, FMC Corporation, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Farrell Lines, Buck Kreihs Company, Inc., International Paper Company, Sank, Inc., Isbrandtsen Co Inc, Chiquita Brands International, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., BP Products North American Inc and Zurich American Insurance Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated/Northop Grumman Shipbuilding Inc and Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
3Rd Party Defendant: Eagle Inc., Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust and Uniroyal Inc
Cross Defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv09339
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 121 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #119 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Document contains incorrect Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate Judge 4.** (mm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 120 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #117 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2). **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. Correct date is 7/24/2019. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Document contains incorrect Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate Judge 4.** (mm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 119 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Texaco Inc identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Texaco Inc (Fuller, Melissa)
July 9, 2019 Filing 118 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #116 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Document filed in incorrect case. Document to be re-filed by attorney in correct case.** (mm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 117 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) by Texaco Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A) Attorney Melissa Desormeaux Fuller added to party Texaco Inc(pty:dft).(Fuller, Melissa) Modified text/submission date on 7/9/2019 (mm).
July 8, 2019 Filing 116 **ERROR-ATTORNEY FILED IN INCORRECT CASE-DOC TO BE REFILED IN CORRECT CASE** Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Texaco Inc identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Texaco Inc (Fuller, Melissa) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (mm).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that oral argument in this matter currently set for Wednesday, July 10, 2019 is cancelled. The Court will determine whether oral argument will be helpful and will reschedule the date if necessary. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/2/2019.(mm)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Eldon E. Fallon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/27/2019.(jeg)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING #111 MOTION to Continue Submission Date filed by Harry Marsh. The #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, and MOTION for More Definite Statement is rescheduled for 7/24/2019. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/19/2019.(jls)
June 19, 2019 Filing 112 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #111 MOTION to Continue Submission Date. **Document contains incorrect District Judge and Incorrect Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section L Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate 4, Magistrate Judge Karen Well Roby.** (jeg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 111 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date by Harry Marsh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galante, Scott)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING #105 Joint MOTION to Continue Submission Date and Oral Argument on Motion to Remand, and the oral argument and submission date for #51 MOTION to Remand to State Court is reset to July 10, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/12/2019.(jeg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 108 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #105 Joint MOTION to Continue Submission Date and Oral Argument on Motion to Remand. **Filing attorney did not enter Harry Marsh as additional filer in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Judge Wendy B Vitter no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/11/2019.(jeg)
June 11, 2019 Filing 107 **DEFICIENT** NOTICE of Appearance by Milele N. St. Julien on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation. Attorney Milele N. St. Julien added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft).(St. Julien, Milele) Modified on 6/12/2019 (jeg).
June 11, 2019 Filing 106 **DEFICIENT** NOTICE of Appearance by Milele N. St. Julien on behalf of Bayer CropScience, Inc.. Attorney Milele N. St. Julien added to party Bayer CropScience, Inc.(pty:dft).(St. Julien, Milele) Modified on 6/12/2019 (jeg).
June 11, 2019 Filing 105 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue Submission Date and Oral Argument on Motion to Remand by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated and Harry Marsh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 6/12/2019 (jeg).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #52 Motion to Quash Re-Notice of Video Deposition is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on June 10, 2019. (mp)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Resetting Hearing on Plaintiff's #52 MOTION to Quash Re-Notice of Video Deposition: Motion Hearing with Oral Argument set for 6/12/2019 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(mp)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Eldon E. Fallon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/3/2019.(jeg)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #96 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for attorney David Wayne O'Quinn for defendant, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/3/2019. (sa)
June 3, 2019 Filing 100 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Cross-Claim by Zurich American Insurance Company. Attorney Marc E. Devenport added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:def).(Devenport, Marc) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (jeg).
May 31, 2019 Filing 99 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Original Petition for Damages by Ingersoll-Rand Company. Attorney Angela M. Bowlin added to party Ingersoll-Rand Company(pty:dft).(Bowlin, Angela)
May 31, 2019 Filing 98 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Original Petition for Damages by FMC Corporation. Attorney Angela M. Bowlin added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft).(Bowlin, Angela)
May 30, 2019 Filing 97 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal Inc (Arthur, Mary)
May 29, 2019 Filing 96 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record David W. O'Quinn by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 5/30/2019 (jeg).
May 28, 2019 Filing 95 **DEFICIENT** NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Melancon on behalf of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Melancon, David) Modified on 5/29/2019 (jeg).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER- ORDERED that there be oral argument on #51 MOTION to Remand to State Court on 6/12/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/28/2019.(jeg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 93 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #91 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. **Document contains correct Magistrate Judge, but incorrect Division. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge 4. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 92 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #90 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. **Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate 4 Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 91 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls, Inc. by Goulds Pumps LLC. Attorney Lauren Ann McCulloch added to party Goulds Pumps LLC(pty:dft).(McCulloch, Lauren)
May 24, 2019 Filing 90 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Third-Party Demands of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Uniroyal Inc. Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Inc(pty:3pd).(Arthur, Mary)
May 23, 2019 Filing 89 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by John Crane Inc identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group PLC for John Crane Inc (Rand, Kenan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 88 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Corss-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by BP Products North American Inc. Attorney Janet Wessler Marshall added to party BP Products North American Inc(pty:dft).(Marshall, Janet) Modified text on 5/29/2019 (jeg).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: My son-in-law, T. Patrick O'Leary, is a partner of the Frilot, L.L.C. firm, which represents a defendant in this matter. Accordingly, I am required to recuse myself from this matter. Judicial Conference of the United States, Committee on Codes of Conduct, Advisory Opinion No. 58 (Aug. 9, 1978, revised July 10, 1998) (citing Canon 3C(1)(d)(ii) and (iii)). The Clerk of Court is directed to reallot this matter to another Magistrate Judge Division of this court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that oral argument previously scheduled before me on May 29, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. on plaintiff's Motion to Quash and for Protective Order for the Re-Notice of Video Deposition of Harry Marsh, Record Doc. No. #52 , is hereby CANCELLED. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/23/2019.(mmv) (J. Fallon, MJ Roby, Case Mgr)
May 23, 2019 Filing 86 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #51 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(jeg)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING #76 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/23/2019. (jeg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 84 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (McCoy, Lacey)
May 22, 2019 Filing 83 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Cross Claim and Third Party Demand of Huntington Ingalls, Inc by General Electric Company. Attorney Lacey Taylor McCoy added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft).(McCoy, Lacey) Modified text on 5/23/2019 (jeg).
May 22, 2019 Filing 82 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc., Corporate Parent GAMCO Investors, Inc. for CBS Corporation (McCoy, Lacey)
May 22, 2019 Filing 81 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Cross Claim and Third Party Demand of Huntington Ingalls, Inc by CBS Corporation. Attorney Lacey Taylor McCoy added to party CBS Corporation(pty:dft).(McCoy, Lacey) Modified text on 5/23/2019 (jeg).
May 22, 2019 Filing 80 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Cross Claim and Third Party Demand of Huntington Ingalls, Inc. by Anco Insulations Inc. Attorney Margaret M. Joffe added to party Anco Insulations Inc(pty:dft).(Joffe, Margaret)
May 22, 2019 Filing 79 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #77 Request/Statement of Oral Argument. **Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 76. Clerk removed link to document. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 78 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #76 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. **Proposed Pleading contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section L. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
May 21, 2019 Filing 77 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated regarding #51 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Melancon, David) Modified text/linkage on 5/22/2019 (jeg).
May 21, 2019 Filing 76 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading- Memorandum in Opposition, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (jeg).
May 21, 2019 Filing 75 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #74 Answer to Complaint. **Document contains incorrect Name of Presiding Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section L Judge Eldon E. Fallon. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 74 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages by Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc. Attorney Jade M. Wandell added to party Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc.(pty:dft).(Wandell, Jade) Modified text/linkage on 5/21/2019 (jeg).
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re (1) Defendants' Request for Oral Argument, Record Doc. No. #64 ; (2) Defendants' Motion for Civil Contempt and Sanctions, Record Doc. No. #63 . DENIED as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/20/2019.(mmv)
May 20, 2019 Filing 72 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #70 Answer to Complaint. **1. Document contains incorrect section. All future pleadings must reflect Section L. No further action necessary. 2. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Answer to Cross-Claim. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 71 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #69 Answer to Complaint. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. No further action necessary. 2. Document contains incorrect section. All future pleadings must reflect Section L. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
May 17, 2019 Filing 70 ANSWER to #37 Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Triplex Inc. (Carpenter, Edward) Modified text/event on 5/20/2019 (jeg).
May 17, 2019 Filing 69 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Plaintiff's First Supplemental and Amended Petition for Damages by Triplex Inc. (Carpenter, Edward) Modified text on 5/20/2019 (jeg).
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: At the request of counsel for defendant, Record Doc. No. #61 , oral argument on plaintiff's Motion to Quash and for Protective Order for the Re-Notice of Video Deposition of Harry Marsh, Record Doc. No. #52 , is granted, and will be conducted on MAY 29, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr., 500 Poydras Street, Hale Boggs Building, Room B-421, New Orleans, Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/16/2019.(mmv)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER re #62 Motion to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs Motion to Quash and for Protective Order for the Re-Notice of Video Deposition of Harry Marsh. DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/16/2019. (mmv)
May 15, 2019 Filing 66 Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #34 Directive. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 5/17/2019 (jeg).
May 15, 2019 Filing 65 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #59 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney selected incorrect filed. Correct filer is Sank Inc. Clerk took corrective action by changing the filer. No further action necessary. (jeg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 64 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated regarding #63 MOTION for Sanctions (Melancon, David)
May 15, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Sanctions by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Notice of Submission)(Melancon, David)
May 15, 2019 Filing 62 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Motion to Quash (rec doc 52) by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (jeg).
May 15, 2019 Filing 61 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated regarding #52 MOTION to Quash Re-Notice of Video Deposition (Melancon, David)
May 15, 2019 Filing 60 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #52 MOTION to Quash Re-Notice of Video Deposition . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Melancon, David)
May 14, 2019 Filing 59 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal to Cross-Claim by Sank, Inc. Attorney H. Philip Radecker, Jr added to party Buck Kreihs Company, Inc.(pty:crd).(Radecker, H.) Modified text on 5/15/2019 (jeg).
May 14, 2019 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Cross-Claim of Huntington Ingalls, Inc. by John Crane Inc.(Rand, Kenan)
May 14, 2019 Filing 57 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal and Plaintiffs' Original and First Supplemental and Amending Petition by John Crane Inc.Attorney Kenan Slade Rand, Jr added to party John Crane Inc(pty:dft).(Rand, Kenan) Modified text on 5/15/2019 (jeg).
May 14, 2019 Filing 56 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #53 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, #54 Answer to Complaint, #55 Answer to Crossclaim. **Documents contain incorrect section. All future pleadings must reflect Section L. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 55 ANSWER to #37 Crossclaim, with Jury Demand and Defenses by Chas. Kurz & Company Inc., Chiquita Brands International, Inc., Farrell Lines, National Bulk Carriers, Inc.(LaVie, Kevin) Modified text on 5/14/2019 (jeg).
May 13, 2019 Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff's First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages and Defenses by Chas. Kurz & Company Inc., Chiquita Brands International, Inc., Farrell Lines, National Bulk Carriers, Inc.(LaVie, Kevin) Modified text on 5/14/2019 (jeg).
May 13, 2019 Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand and Defenses by Chas. Kurz & Company Inc., Chiquita Brands International, Inc., Farrell Lines, National Bulk Carriers, Inc.Attorney Kevin J. LaVie added to party Chas. Kurz & Company Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin J. LaVie added to party Chiquita Brands International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin J. LaVie added to party Farrell Lines(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin J. LaVie added to party National Bulk Carriers, Inc(pty:dft).(LaVie, Kevin) Modified text on 5/14/2019 (jeg).
May 10, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Quash Re-Notice of Video Deposition by Harry Marsh. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit)(Galante, Scott) Modified text on 5/13/2019 (jeg). Modified to edit referral on 5/24/2019 (mmv).
May 10, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Harry Marsh. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Notice of Submission)(Galante, Scott)
May 10, 2019 Filing 50 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Remand to State Court by Harry Marsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Proposed Order)(Galante, Scott) Modified on 5/10/2019 (jeg).
May 10, 2019 Filing 49 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #47 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. **Document contains incorrect Section and Incomplete Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section L, Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge 2, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
May 10, 2019 Filing 48 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #46 Answer to Crossclaim. **1. Document contains incorrect Section and Incomplete Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section L, Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge 2, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. No further action necessary. 2. Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 37. Clerk properly linked document to document 1. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
May 9, 2019 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Huntington Ingalls Cross-Claim by IDEX Corporation. Attorney James Matthew Matherne added to party IDEX Corporation(pty:crd).(Matherne, James) Modified text on 5/10/2019 (jeg).
May 9, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Grefco Inc. (Matherne, James) Modified text on 5/10/2019 (jeg).
May 9, 2019 Filing 45 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #39 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #40 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, #41 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, #42 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Documents contain incorrect section. All future pleadings must reflect Section L. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
May 9, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE of Removal Cross Claim and Third-Party Demand of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by A.W. Chesterson Company. Attorney Helen Meredith Buckley added to party A.W. Chesterson Company(pty:crd).(Buckley, Helen) Modified text on 5/10/2019 (jeg).
May 8, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION for More Definite Statement by International Paper Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:dft).(Penn, Elizabeth)
May 8, 2019 Filing 42 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bexar Canyon Management, Inc. (Barfield, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Cross-Claim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Warren Pumps LLC.Attorney Daniel E. Oser added to party Warren Pumps LLC (pty:crd).(Oser, Daniel) Modified text on 5/9/2019 (jeg).
May 8, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Warren Pumps LLC. Attorney Daniel E. Oser added to party Warren Pumps LLC (pty:dft).(Oser, Daniel)
May 8, 2019 Filing 39 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Warren Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent IMO Industries, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Warren Pumps LLC (Oser, Daniel) Modified text on 5/9/2019 (jeg).
May 7, 2019 Filing 38 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #36 Answer to Complaint. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
May 7, 2019 Filing 37 Hopeman Brothers, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated and, CROSSCLAIM against Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust by Hopeman Brothers Inc.Attorney Troy Nathan Bell added to party Hopeman Brothers Inc(pty:crd).(Bell, Troy)
May 6, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) Modified linkage on 5/7/2019 (jeg).
May 6, 2019 Filing 35 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 5/7/2019 (jeg).
May 2, 2019 Filing 34 DIRECTIVE of the Court pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. By the Clerk.(jeg)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #4 Defendant's Motion to Expedite Discovery. GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is granted as set forth in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that oral argument previously set in this matter on May 1, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. before me is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/1/2019. (mmv)
May 1, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Compliance by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit- State Court Pleadings)Attorney Jacqueline Romero added to party Crane Company(pty:dft).(Romero, Jacqueline) Modified text on 5/2/2019 (jeg).
May 1, 2019 Filing 31 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Crane Company (Romero, Jacqueline)
May 1, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal , Cross-Claim and Third-Party Demand of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(Lightfoot, Christopher)
May 1, 2019 Filing 29 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers Inc (Bell, Troy)
April 30, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal ,First Supplemental and Amending Petition by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Attorney Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Jalenak, Jay) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (jeg).
April 30, 2019 Filing 27 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jalenak, Jay)
April 30, 2019 Filing 26 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #25 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section L. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
April 30, 2019 Filing 25 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Triplex Inc. (Carpenter, Edward)
April 29, 2019 Filing 24 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #18 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section L. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
April 29, 2019 Filing 23 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #16 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #17 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section L. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
April 29, 2019 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section L Judge Eldon E. Fallon. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
April 29, 2019 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #14 Notice of Compliance. **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section L Judge Eldon E. Fallon. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
April 29, 2019 Filing 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 Notice of Compliance, #12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section L Judge Eldon E. Fallon. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
April 29, 2019 Filing 19 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section L Judge Eldon E. Fallon. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
April 26, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Avondale's Cross-Claim by Bexar Canyon Management, Inc. Attorney David A. Barfield added to party Bexar Canyon Management, Inc.(pty:crd).(Barfield, David) Modified text on 4/29/2019 (jeg).
April 26, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Petition for Damages and First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. Attorney Christopher Kelly Lightfoot added to party Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lightfoot, Christopher)
April 26, 2019 Filing 16 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
April 25, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand Answer to Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Owens Illinois, Inc.Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party Owens Illinois, Inc(pty:crd).(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 4/29/2019 (jeg).
April 25, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Compliance by Crescent Materials Service Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Attorney Donna M. Young added to party Crescent Materials Service Inc(pty:dft).(Young, Donna)
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Crescent Materials Service Inc (Young, Donna)
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Sank, Inc. (Radecker, H.) Modified text on 4/29/2019 (jeg).
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Compliance by Sank, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Attorney H. Philip Radecker, Jr added to party Sank, Inc.(pty:dft).(Radecker, H.) Modified text on 4/29/2019 (jeg).
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Answer to Petition for Damages by Grefco Inc. Attorney James Matthew Matherne added to party Grefco Inc.(pty:dft).(Matherne, James)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: At the request of counsel for defendant, Record Doc. No. #5 , oral argument on defendant's Motion to Expedite Discovery, Record Doc. No. #4 , is granted, and will be conducted on MAY 1, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr., 500 Poydras Street, Hale Boggs Building, Room B-421, New Orleans, Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/17/2019.(mmv)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Motion to Expedite Consideration of Avondale's Motion to Expedite Discovery. DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/17/2019. (mmv)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 4/16/2019. (NEF: Judge Fallon) (ajn)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite #4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery re: video deposition prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated/Northop Grumman Shipbuilding Inc. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 4/17/2019 to link documents(ajn).
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated/Northop Grumman Shipbuilding Inc regarding #4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery re: video deposition prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Melancon, David)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery re: video deposition prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated/Northop Grumman Shipbuilding Inc. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Melancon, David)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Plaintiff's First Supplemental and Amending Petition by Bexar Canyon Management, Inc..Attorney David A. Barfield added to party Bexar Canyon Management, Inc.(pty:dft).(Barfield, David)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil Distrct Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-00687 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7569030) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated/Northop Grumman Shipbuilding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated/Northop Grumman Shipbuilding Inc(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated/Northop Grumman Shipbuilding Inc(pty:crc), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated/Northop Grumman Shipbuilding Inc(pty:3pp).(Melancon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marsh v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LGS Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Daniel E. Oser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bexar Canyon Management, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Production North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain-Teed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterson Company
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman
Represented By: Helen Meredith Buckley
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc.
Represented By: David Joseph Bourgeois
Represented By: Jade M. Wandell
Represented By: Ryan M. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Donna M. Young
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Bulk Carriers, Inc
Represented By: Kevin J. LaVie
Represented By: Robert J. Barbier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Inc
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Chelsea Elizabeth Gaudin
Represented By: Michelle Miller Roy
Represented By: Tim D. Gray
Represented By: McCann Elizabeth LeFeve
Represented By: Melissa Desormeaux Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grefco Inc.
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescent Materials Service Inc
Represented By: Donna M. Young
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Brands International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chas. Kurz & Company Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J. LaVie
Represented By: Robert J. Barbier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDEX Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc
Represented By: Meredith R. Durham
Represented By: Lauren B. Dietzen
Represented By: Kenan Slade Rand, Jr
Represented By: Scott H. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triplex Inc.
Represented By: Edward Wade Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulations Inc
Represented By: Douglas R. Elliott
Represented By: Donna M. Young
Represented By: Margaret M. Joffe
Represented By: Jamie Hebert Baglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Dale Roquemore
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens Illinois, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isbrandtsen Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farrell Lines
Represented By: Kevin J. LaVie
Represented By: Robert J. Barbier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buck Kreihs Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sank, Inc.
Represented By: H. Philip Radecker, Jr.
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isbrandtsen Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Brands International, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J. LaVie
Represented By: Robert J. Barbier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North American Inc
Represented By: Jacques P. DeGruy
Represented By: Janet Wessler Marshall
Represented By: Aaron Benjamin Greenbaum
Represented By: Salvador Joseph Pusateri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee M. LeBouef
Represented By: Edward T. Hayes
Represented By: Marc E. Devenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated/Northop Grumman Shipbuilding Inc
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Eagle Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal Inc
Represented By: Amy Louise Maccherone
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Marsh
Represented By: Stephanie Moore Hartman
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?