Jackson v. Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Tiesha Jackson
Defendant: Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09341
Filed: April 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with as to Pinnacle by Tiesha Jackson. (Imbraguglio, Niko)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Resurgent Capital Services, LP by Tiesha Jackson. (Imbraguglio, Niko) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (sa).
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mm)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
April 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Resurgent Captial Services, L.P., Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7570386) filed by Tiesha Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, L.P.)Attorney Niko Angelo Imbraguglio added to party Tiesha Jackson(pty:pla).(Imbraguglio, Niko) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Credit Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiesha Jackson
Represented By: Niko Angelo Imbraguglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?