Mohare v. Khopkar
Plaintiff: Pradnesh Mohare
Defendant: Rahul Khopkar
Case Number: 2:2019cv09477
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2019 02:30 PM before case manager by telephone. The Court will initiate the telephone conference call. (ecm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rahul Khopkar.(Smith, J.)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Rahul Khopkar answer due 6/12/2019. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/21/2019. (ecm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Rahul Khopkar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney J. Arthur Smith, III added to party Rahul Khopkar(pty:dft).(Smith, J.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Rahul Khopkar served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Sahuc, Richard)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rahul Khopkar. (sa)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Sahuc, Richard)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rahul Khopkar (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7579018) filed by Pradnesh Mohare. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Richard Thomas Sahuc added to party Pradnesh Mohare(pty:pla).(Sahuc, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohare v. Khopkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rahul Khopkar
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pradnesh Mohare
Represented By: Richard Thomas Sahuc
Represented By: Gregory D. Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?