Eisenhardt v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Margaret Eisenhardt
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., K&B Louisiana Corporation, Johnson & Johnson and Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09553
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #19 Notice. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 15. (mp)
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of supplemental authority by Margaret Eisenhardt re #15 Emergency Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified text/relation on 6/27/2019 (mp).
June 5, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #15 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(mp)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on June 5, 2019. (mp)
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 2 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit 3 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit 4 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #6 Exhibit 5 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #7 Exhibit 6 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #8 Exhibit 7 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #9 Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera)
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION to Remand by Margaret Eisenhardt. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D-1, #7 Exhibit D-2, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)(ajn)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to exceed the page limit of the Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand or Motion to Abstain. The motion is set for submission for a determination on the briefs on 6/12/2019. Any requests for expedited consideration shall be set forth in an ex parte separatemotion. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/21/2019. (ajn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court . ***Filing attorney filed documents out of order. The Motion for Leave should have been your main document, with the Motion to Remand, Memo in Support, Notice of Submission and Proposed Order for Leave as attachments. Requests for Oral Argument are always filed separately and not attached to the Motion. Also, a separate Motion and Order is required for expedited consideration. Clerk took corrective action by placing the documents in correct order and re-filing the request for oral argument.*** (ajn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 Request/Statement of Oral Argument regarding #10 Motion to Remand. (ajn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE regarding oral argument re #10 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court. By Clerk.(jrc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Remand to State Court by Margaret Eisenhardt. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Remand, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D1, #7 Exhibit D2, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Proposed Order, #11 Request for Oral Argument, #12 Notice of Submission)(Cheek, Lindsey) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/21/2019) (ajn). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/21/2019) (ajn). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/21/2019) (ajn). (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/21/2019) (ajn). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2019: #13 Proposed Order Motion for Leave to File) (ajn). Modified text on 5/21/2019 to correct event/remove submission date and rearrange documents (ajn).
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Noonan, Claire)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Notice of Compliance. Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to Rec. Doc. 3. Clerk properly linked document to Rec. Doc. 1. No further action is necessary. (mp)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Sossamon, Meera) Modified text/relation on 5/7/2019 (mp).
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York. (Attachments: #1 Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Sossamon, Meera)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer an additional twenty-one (21) days from the date on which responsive pleadings would otherwise be due to file said pleadings. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 4/25/2019. (ajn)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(mp)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2017-10826 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7587523) filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B Part 1, #3 Exhibit B Part 2, #4 Exhibit B Part 3, #5 Exhibit B Part 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Meera Unnithan Sossamon added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Meera Unnithan Sossamon added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft).(Sossamon, Meera)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eisenhardt v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Carlos Andre Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&B Louisiana Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Siemann
Represented By: Lambert Joseph Hassinger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Carlos Andre Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Mindy Brickman
Represented By: Christy L. McMannen
Represented By: Oscar M. Gwin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Eisenhardt
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fransen
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Represented By: Rubiante Lolana Brown
Represented By: Lindsey A. Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?