Gas Light Pro, LLC v. Bevolo et al
Plaintiff: Gas Light Pro, LLC
Defendant: Bevolo Gas & Electric Lights, Inc. and Christopher Bevolo
Case Number: 2:2019cv09559
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
2 Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Christopher Bevolo served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Harrigan, Brad)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Bevolo Gas & Electric Lights, Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Harrigan, Brad)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that the following Section "A" cases are hereby reallotted to Judge Greg Guidry, Section "T" of this Court, effective as of the date of this Order. Case reassigned to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on June 27, 2019.(mp) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/27/2019) (lag).
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Christopher Bevolo, Bevolo Gas & Electric Lights, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ajn)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Gas Light Pro, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Harrigan, Brad)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on April 23, 2019.(mp)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Christopher Bevolo, Bevolo Gas & Electric Lights, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mp)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7588954) filed by Gas Light Pro, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Brad Elliot Harrigan added to party Gas Light Pro, LLC(pty:pla).(Harrigan, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gas Light Pro, LLC v. Bevolo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gas Light Pro, LLC
Represented By: Brad Elliot Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bevolo Gas & Electric Lights, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Bevolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?