Stark v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Kimmy Stark
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, K&B Louisiana Corporation and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv09667
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 Notice. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 11. (mp)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of supplemental authority by Kimmy Stark re #11 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified text/relation on 6/27/2019 (mp).
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #11 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(mp)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on June 5, 2019. (mp)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 2 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit 3 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit 4 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #6 Exhibit 5 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #7 Exhibit 6 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #8 Exhibit 7 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #9 Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Kimmy Stark. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D-1, #7 Exhibit D-2, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)(ajn)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess pages to Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/23/2019. (ajn)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE regarding oral argument on Motion to Remand.By Clerk. (jrc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Kimmy Stark regarding #7 MOTION for Leave to File Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cheek, Lindsey)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kimmy Stark. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Motion to Remand, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Proposed Order-Expedite, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D-1, #9 Exhibit D-2, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Notice of Submission)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified text/referral on 5/23/2019 (mp). Modified attachments text, added "Exparte/Consent" and termed submission date on 5/23/2019 (ajn).
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Sossamon, Meera)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York. (Attachments: #1 Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Noonan, Claire)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer an additional twenty-one (21) days from the date on which responsive pleadings would otherwise be due to file said pleadings. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 4/30/2019. (ajn)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2017-10831 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7594616) filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B -- Part 1, #3 Exhibit B -- Part 2, #4 Exhibit B -- Part 3, #5 Exhibit B -- Part 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Meera Unnithan Sossamon added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Meera Unnithan Sossamon added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft).(Sossamon, Meera)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stark v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Carlos Andre Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Mindy Brickman
Represented By: Christy L. McMannen
Represented By: Oscar M. Gwin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Carlos Andre Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&B Louisiana Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Siemann
Represented By: Jonathan David Lewis
Represented By: Lambert Joseph Hassinger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimmy Stark
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fransen
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Represented By: Rubiante Lolana Brown
Represented By: Lindsey A. Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?