Hudson v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Valorey Hudson
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, K&B Louisiana Corporation and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv09710
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
2 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #24 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority.**Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
July 1, 2019 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by Valorey Hudson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified text/removed referral on 7/1/2019 (am).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/27/2019.(am) (Main Document 23 replaced on 6/27/2019) (lag).
June 26, 2019 Filing 22 **DEFICIENT**NOTICE by Valorey Hudson of supplemental authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified text on 6/27/2019 (am).
June 6, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #19 Emergency MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(jls)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 6/5/2019. (jls)
June 6, 2019 Filing 19 Emergency MOTION to Remand by Valorey Hudson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit D-2, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Notice of Submission)(jls)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #13 motion is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff's motion to remand shall be set for submission on the next available submission date after issuance of this order. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 6/5/2019. (jls)
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading - Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Pleading - Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Pleading - Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Pleading - Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Pleading - Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Pleading - Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Pleading - Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Pleading - Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (jls).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #14 request is DENIED, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 05/23/2019.(am)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 MOTION for Leave to File, Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court. **1) Filing attorney selected multiple reliefs for a single relief motion. Correct event is Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Clerk changed the event. **2) Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. **3) Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent motions are not set for submission. Clerk has removed submission date. **4) Proposed Order for the Motion for Leave should have been added as a separate attachment and not as part of the motion. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary.** (jls)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Valorey Hudson regarding Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified text on 5/23/2019 (am).
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand to State Court by Valorey Hudson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Memo in Support, #3 Proposed Order for Remand, #4 Proposed Exhibit A, #5 Proposed Exhibit B, #6 Proposed Exhibit C, #7 Proposed Exhibit D, #8 Proposed Exhibit D-2, #9 Proposed Exhibit E, #10 Proposed Exhibit F, #11 Proposed Notice of Submission)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified event/text/removed referral and submission date on 5/23/2019 (jls). (Additional attachment added on 5/23/2019: #12 Proposed Order for Motion for Leave to File) (jls).
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(Benach, Carlos) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (am).
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #6 motion is GRANTED. Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. shall file responsive pleadings no later than twenty-one (21) days after the date upon which responsive pleadings would otherwise be due. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 05/07/2019. (am)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #3 Order. (Sossamon, Meera)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Notice (Other).**Document contains incorrect District Judge. All future pleadings must reflect District Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle.** (am)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Recent Court Decision by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York. (Attachments: #1 Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Noonan, Claire) Modified text on 5/2/2019 (am).
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susie Morgan recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (NEF: Judge Lemelle's Chambers)(bwn)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (am).
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Susie Morgan. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/29/19.(sbs)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Attachment 1 was imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image.** (sbs)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. By the Clerk.(sbs)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2017-10834 M-13 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7597154) filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Part 1, #3 Exhibit B - Part 2, #4 Exhibit B - Part 3, #5 Exhibit B - Part 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Meera Unnithan Sossamon added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Meera Unnithan Sossamon added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft).(Sossamon, Meera) Modified text on 4/24/2019 (sbs). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/24/2019) (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Carlos Andre Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Represented By: James B. Irwin, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Mindy Brickman
Represented By: Christy L. McMannen
Represented By: Oscar M. Gwin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Carlos Andre Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Represented By: James B. Irwin, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&B Louisiana Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Siemann
Represented By: Jonathan David Lewis
Represented By: Lambert Joseph Hassinger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valorey Hudson
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fransen
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Represented By: Rubiante Lolana Brown
Represented By: Lindsey A. Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?