Antoine v. Travelers Indemnity Company

Plaintiff: Johari Antoine
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Property Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv09711
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 06/27/2019. (am)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT Final MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Johari Antoine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kiefer, Megan) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (am).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS ORDERED that the action be and it is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action or to seek summary judgment enforcing the compromise if settlement is not consummated, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 05/22/2019.(am)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2019 09:45 AM before case manager by telephone. All parties are to call into the conference at the number listed on the notice. By Clerk. (kac)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Travelers Property Casualty Company.(Centner, Daniel) Modified text on 5/2/2019 (am).
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-2873 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7597163) filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Certificate of Filing of State Court Notice of Removal & Notice to State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Listing Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(b), #7 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Daniel B. Centner added to party Travelers Property Casualty Company(pty:dft).(Centner, Daniel) Modified text on 4/25/2019 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antoine v. Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Daniel B. Centner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Daniel B. Centner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johari Antoine
Represented By: Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr.
Represented By: Megan C. Kiefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?