Preston v. Friedrichs Road Holdings L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Geraldmeka Preston
Defendant: Friedrichs Road Holdings L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09714
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
2 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2019 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (mmv)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Sarah S. Vance no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/3/2019.(mm)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Defendant's Opposition to Preliminary Injunction re: rec. doc. 3 filed by Geraldmeka Preston re #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Adams, Hannah) Modified text on 5/28/2019 (mm).
May 18, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Friedrichs Road Holdings L.L.C. re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Rouzan, Don)
May 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Friedrichs Road Holdings L.L.C. (Rouzan, Don)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: In light of plaintiff's #3 motion for a preliminary injunction, defendant shall have 21 days to respond to the motion. Defendant's response may include affidavit evidence. Plaintiff shall have 7 days from the date that the response is filed to reply. The Court will determine the need for any further proceedings once it receives the parties' briefs. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/26/2019.(mm)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. IT IS ORDERED that the motion for a temporary restraining order is denied for a lack of a showing of substantial threat of irreparable harm. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/25/2019. (mm)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Friedrichs Road Holdings L.L.C. (cg)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 4/25/2019. (cg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2019: #1 Pauper Letter) (cg).
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Geraldmeka Preston. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits to Memorandum in Support of TRO and PI, #3 Certificate of Notice to Opposing Counsel, #4 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order , #5 Proposed Order to Show Cause)(Adams, Hannah) Modified text on 4/24/2019 (jls).
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Geraldmeka Preston. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Adams, Hannah) Modified text/added referral on 4/24/2019 (jls).
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief, Declaratory Relief, Damages, and Attorney's Fees against Friedrichs Road Holdings L.L.C. (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Geraldmeka Preston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Hannah Draper Adams added to party Geraldmeka Preston(pty:pla).(Adams, Hannah) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/24/2019) (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preston v. Friedrichs Road Holdings L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldmeka Preston
Represented By: Hannah Draper Adams
Represented By: David Holman Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friedrichs Road Holdings L.L.C.
Represented By: Don A. Rouzan
Represented By: Dana Jude Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?