Lea v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Phyllis Lea
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., K&B Louisiana Corporation, Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv09716
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Phyllis Lea of supplemental authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cheek, Lindsey)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand by Phyllis Lea. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Notice of Submission)(jeg)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Leave to exceed the twenty-five (25) page limit for her Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Emergency Motion to Remand. The motion is set for submission on June 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/6/2019. (jeg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #9 MOTION for Leave to File Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(jeg)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Opposition. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/5/2019. (jeg)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera) Modified text on 6/5/2019 (jeg).
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 MOTION for Leave to File Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court . **1. Filing attorney selected unnecessary additional event - MOTION to Remand to State Court. Clerk took corrective action by removing the event. No further action necessary. 2. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary. 3. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and remove submission date. No further action necessary. 4. Document lists attorney Jeanne L. St. Romain, who is not counsel of record for this party. Where counsel has appeared for any party, other counsel may appear for the same party only Upon motion.** (jeg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 **DEFICIENT** Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Phyllis Lea regarding #9 MOTION for Leave to File Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified on 5/23/2019 (jeg).
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Phyllis Lea. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Proposed Pleading, #5 Proposed Pleading, #6 Proposed Pleading, #7 Proposed Pleading, #8 Proposed Pleading, #9 Proposed Pleading, #10 Proposed Pleading, #11 Proposed Pleading, #12 Notice of Submission)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified text/event on 5/23/2019 (jeg).
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Benach, Carlos) Modified text on 5/23/2019 (jeg).
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #3 Directive of the Court. (Sossamon, Meera) Modified text on 5/14/2019 (jeg).
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. The Defendants are granted an additional twenty-one (21) days from the date on which responsive pleadings would otherwise be due to file said pleadings. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/1/2019. (jeg)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York. (Attachments: #1 Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Noonan, Claire)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE of the Court pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. By the Clerk.(jeg)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 18-2613 Div N Sec 8 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7597503) filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B -- Part 1, #3 Exhibit B -- Part 2, #4 Exhibit B -- Part 3, #5 Exhibit B -- Part 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Meera Unnithan Sossamon added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Meera Unnithan Sossamon added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft).(Sossamon, Meera) Modified text on 4/30/2019 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lea v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Carlos Andre Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&B Louisiana Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Carlos Andre Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Lea
Represented By: Daniel Julien McGlynn
Represented By: Rubiante Lolana Brown
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fransen
Represented By: Lindsey A. Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?