Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. Boullion et al

Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Donavon J Steib, Israel J Steib, Joseph Eric Courville, Patsy Soileau Courville, Kevin M Neyrey, Daniel Joseph Boullion, Dwane J Steib, Michael Wade Courville, Amanda Granier Steib, Mavis Todd Courville and Mary Patsy Soileau Courville
Case Number: 2:2019cv09845
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
2 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE regarding oral argument re #22 Rule 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Amanda Granier Steib, Mavis Todd Courville, Dwane J Steib, Donavon J Steib, Mary Patsy Soileau Courville, Daniel Joseph Boullion, Michael Wade Courville, Joseph Eric Courville, Israel J Steib. By Clerk.(mmv)
July 2, 2019 Filing 32 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company regarding #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pipes, H.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Redacted). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pipes, H.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 30 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Memorandum in Opposition to Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Pleading Placeholder)(Pipes, H.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 29 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #28 Scheduling Order. **Document filed in error, and will be noted as such. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 **ERROR** SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Bench Trial set for 3/9/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. All discovery must be completed by 1/9/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jeg) Modified on 6/10/2019 (jeg).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTIED #24 MOTION to Continue Submission Date on #22 Motion to Dismiss, and that thesubmission date of R. Doc. 22 is hereby continued until 7/10/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/10/2019.(jeg)
June 7, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Isreal J. Steib served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Klaffky, Stephen) Modified text on 6/7/2019 (jeg).
June 7, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Daniel Joseph Boullion served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Klaffky, Stephen) Modified text on 6/7/2019 (jeg).
June 5, 2019 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date #22 Motion to Dismiss by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pipes, H.) Modified text on 6/6/2019. (jeg)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Sarah S. Vance no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/3/2019.(mm)
May 31, 2019 Filing 22 Rule 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Daniel Joseph Boullion, Joseph Eric Courville, Mary Patsy Soileau Courville, Mavis Todd Courville, Michael Wade Courville, Amanda Granier Steib, Donavon J Steib, Dwane J Steib, Israel J Steib. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8)Attorney Jonathan Brett Clement added to party Daniel Joseph Boullion(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Brett Clement added to party Joseph Eric Courville(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Brett Clement added to party Mary Patsy Soileau Courville(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Brett Clement added to party Mavis Todd Courville(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Brett Clement added to party Michael Wade Courville(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Brett Clement added to party Amanda Granier Steib(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Brett Clement added to party Donavon J Steib(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Brett Clement added to party Dwane J Steib(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Brett Clement added to party Israel J Steib(pty:dft).(Clement, Jonathan) Modified text on 5/31/2019 (mm).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the #20 Motion is hereby GRANTED; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the time for Defendant Kevin M. Neyrey, solely in his capacity as Trustee of the Reilly-Benton Asbestos Bodily Injury Claim Trust to file responsive pleadings to the Complaint is hereby extended by 31 days to and including July 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/31/2019. (mm)
May 30, 2019 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #4 Complaint by Kevin M Neyrey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Ashley L. Belleau added to party Kevin M Neyrey(pty:dft).(Belleau, Ashley) Modified text on 5/30/2019 (mm).
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Kevin M. Neyrey served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Klaffky, Stephen) Modified text/answer due date/event on 5/28/2019. (mm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Michael Wade Courville served on 5/19/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Klaffky, Stephen) Modified text/answer due date/event on 5/28/2019(mm).
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Joseph Eric Courville served on 5/19/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Klaffky, Stephen) Modified text/answer due date/event on 5/28/2019 (mm).
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 Certificate of Service, #13 Certificate of Service, #15 Certificate of Service, #12 Certificate of Service. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Summons Returned Executed. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Mavis Todd Courville served on 5/11/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Klaffky, Stephen) Modified text/answer due date/event on 5/21/2019 (mm).
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Mary Patsy Soileau Courville served on 5/11/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Klaffky, Stephen) Modified text/answer due date/event on 5/21/2019 (mm).
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Dwane J Steib served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (Klaffky, Stephen) Modified text/answer due date/event on 5/21/2019 (mm).
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Donavon J Steib served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (Klaffky, Stephen) Modified text/event/answer due date on 5/21/2019 (mm).
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Summons Returned Executed. **Filing attorney selected the incorrect party served and entered the incorrect date served. Correct party served was Amanda Granier Steib on 5/16/2019.** (mm)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Amanda Granier Steib served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (Klaffky, Stephen) Modified text/party served/answer due date on 5/17/2019 (mm).
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert A. Kole. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/8/2019. (mm)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Douglas R. Gooding. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/8/2019. (mm)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Daniel Joseph Boullion, Joseph Eric Courville, Mary Patsy Soileau Courville, Mavis Todd Courville, Michael Wade Courville, Kevin M Neyrey, Amanda Granier Steib, Donavon J Steib, Dwane J Steib, Israel J Steib. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(mm)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Robert A. Kole) (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7629803) by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 E-File Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Pipes, H.)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Douglas R. Gooding) (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7629760) by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 E-File Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Pipes, H.)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Daniel Joseph Boullion, Joseph Eric Courville, Mary Patsy Soileau Courville, Mavis Todd Courville, Michael Wade Courville, Kevin M Neyrey, Amanda Granier Steib, Donavon J Steib, Dwane J Steib, Israel J Steib (Fee previously paid) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to All Defendants)(Klaffky, Stephen)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiffs motion to seal is DENIED, and the Court instead orders plaintiff to file into the record a redacted complaint. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/3/2019.(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. Boullion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donavon J Steib
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Israel J Steib
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Eric Courville
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patsy Soileau Courville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M Neyrey
Represented By: Ashley L. Belleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Joseph Boullion
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwane J Steib
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wade Courville
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Granier Steib
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mavis Todd Courville
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Patsy Soileau Courville
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen R. Klaffky
Represented By: Susan Muller Rogge
Represented By: H. Minor Pipes, III
Represented By: Robert A. Kole
Represented By: Douglas R. Gooding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?