Verdin v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: James Verdin
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2019cv09927
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/3/2019.(mmv)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (mmv)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons. The pdf should not have the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mmv)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
April 30, 2019 Filing fee received from Pellegrin, David C.:Receipt 053L-7610135 $ 400.00 (cc)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Fee previously paid) filed by James Verdin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney David C. Pellegrin added to party James Verdin(pty:pla).(Pellegrin, David) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/1/2019) (mmv).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verdin v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Verdin
Represented By: David C. Pellegrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?