Barthelemy v. CHS-SLE Land, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Kalan L Barthelemy and Kalan L. Barthelemy
Defendant: CHS, Inc. and CHS-SLE Land, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10086
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to CHS, Inc., CHS-SLE Land, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mmv)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons Defendant 2 Summons)(McKenna, Warren)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 **DEFICIENT** Summons Submitted for Issuance (McKenna, Warren) Modified on 5/10/2019 (mmv).
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **1) Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. **2) Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Attorney has refiled the civil cover sheet correctly, see rec. doc. 3.** (mmv)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (McKenna, Warren)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 **DEFICIENT** Summons Submitted for Issuance (McKenna, Warren) Modified on 5/6/2019 (mmv).
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7621397) filed by Kalan L Barthelemy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)Attorney Warren McKenna, III added to party Kalan L Barthelemy(pty:pla).(McKenna, Warren) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/6/2019) (mmv).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barthelemy v. CHS-SLE Land, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalan L Barthelemy
Represented By: Warren McKenna, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalan L. Barthelemy
Represented By: Warren McKenna, III
Represented By: Halima Narcisse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS-SLE Land, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?