Flores v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada

Plaintiff: Dennis Flores
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Case Number: 2:2019cv10105
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Toledano, Reagan)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Toledano, Reagan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (jeg)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (djg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7624545) filed by Dennis Flores. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Reagan Levert Toledano added to party Dennis Flores(pty:pla).(Toledano, Reagan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Flores
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Represented By: James Frederick Willeford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?