Horton v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Plaintiff: Geornette Horton
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv10140
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. Bench Trial set for 3/30/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. All discovery must be completed by 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice)(clc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE for 6/26/2019 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone(clc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (McDiarmid, Molly)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal and Affirmative Defenses by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(McDiarmid, Molly) Modified text/link on 6/4/2019 (sa).
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I Certified Copy of Plaintiff's Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit II Certified Copy of Plaintiff's Request for Written Notice, #3 Exhibit III Certified Copy of Service Return)(McDiarmid, Molly) Modified text/event on 5/23/2019 (sa).
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC; answer due 6/4/2019. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 5/15/2019. (sa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDiarmid, Molly)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Issued by Clerk. (sa)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, Parish of Jefferson, case number 793077 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7626068) filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)Attorney Molly C McDiarmid added to party Lowe's Home Centers, LLC(pty:dft).(McDiarmid, Molly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geornette Horton
Represented By: Pius Akamdi Obioha
Represented By: Daniel Chike Obioha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Molly C McDiarmid
Represented By: Susan W. Furr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?