Express Lien Inc v. Handle, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Express Lien Inc
Defendant: Jeffrey Nadolny, Handle, Inc. and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2019cv10156
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond is GRANTED and that Defendants' deadline to file responsive pleadings is extended from July 8, 2019 to July 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/3/2019. (mm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re #1 Complaint. ** Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (mm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re #1 Complaint by Handle, Inc., Jeffrey Nadolny (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Glikin, Joshua) Modified text/filers on 7/2/2019 (mm).
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua Aaron Glikin. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua A. Glikin (Fee previously paid) by Handle, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit, #4 Exhibit C - ECF Registration form)(Marrero, Jessica)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. **Document filed in error. See rec doc. 5 for correct entry. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua A. Glikin (Fee previously paid) by Handle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of J. Glikin in support of Motion PHV, #3 Exhibit C - ECF Registration Form)(Marrero, Jessica) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (mm).
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 **FILED IN ERROR- SEE REC. DOC. 5 FOR CORRECT FILING** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joshua A. Glikin (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7725268) by Handle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of J. Glikin in support of Motion PHV)Attorney Jessica L. Marrero added to party Handle, Inc.(pty:dft).(Marrero, Jessica) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (mm).
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **1. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the civil cover sheet. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. 2. Attachments had duplicate descriptions. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7627408) filed by Express Lien Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Terms of Use Acceptance Logs & Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B - Resources & Content Marketing Product Plagiarism and Reverse Engineering, #4 Exhibit C - List of Downloads, #5 Exhibit D - Website and Services Reverse Engineering, #6 Exhibit E - Third-Party Violations, #7 Exhibit F - Word-for-Word Copyright Violations) Attorney Nathan L. Budde added to party Express Lien Inc(pty:pla).(Budde, Nathan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/8/2019) (mm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2019: #8 AO 121 Form) (mm). Modified text on 5/8/2019 (mm). (Mailed AO 121 Form to Register of Copyrights)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Express Lien Inc v. Handle, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Nadolny
Represented By: Christopher K. Ralston
Represented By: Lindsay J. Calhoun
Represented By: Arthur Raymond Kraatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handle, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Glikin
Represented By: Jessica L. Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Express Lien Inc
Represented By: Nathan L. Budde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?