Larkin et al v. Juneau et al
Plaintiff: Billy F. Larkin and Hotel Security Specialists, LLC
Defendant: Patrick Juneau, BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10295
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Filing Requests for Summons and Summons Returns; ORDERED that requests for summons shall be filed in the docket for the member case, as opposed to the master docket. FURTHER ORDERED that summons returns shall not be filed into any docket, master or member, unless filing the summons return becomes necessary (for example, in connection with a motion for default judgment). When it is necessary to file a summons return, the attorney shall avoid filing the summons return as a separate, stand-alone document in the master docket. Instead, the summons return shall be filed as an exhibit to the motion, etc., to which it relates. (Doc #10204 in 10-md-2179). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 05/20/2013. (gec)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDERS #1, #11, #12 1st Amended, #25, #31, & #41 2nd Amended. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Attachments: #1 PTO #11, #2 PTO #12 1st Amended, #3 PTO #25, #4 PTO #31, #5 PTO #41 2nd Amended)(gec)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., Patrick Juneau. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ajn) (cc: USM w/Pauper Order and Complaint)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $0.00 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Billy F. Larkin in monthly payments as set out in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 6/18/2019. (cc: Warden)(ajn)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Billy F. Larkin. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Original IFP)(cg)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 Response/Reply by Billy F. Larkin to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (cg)(Does not cure deficiency)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT (Partial Compliance) against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., Patrick Juneau filed by Billy F. Larkin.(cg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Billy F. Larkin. (jeg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 6/3/2019. (cg)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hotel Security Specialists, LLC, Billy F. Larkin. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cg)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT: COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Billy F. Larkin, Hotel Security Specialists, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(cg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larkin et al v. Juneau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Juneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy F. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hotel Security Specialists, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?