Whiticar v. New Orleans City et al
Plaintiff: Mark Whiticar
Defendant: New Orleans City and Police Department
Case Number: 2:2019cv10355
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
2 Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Mark Whiticar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ajn)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION to Dismiss. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Failure to State a Claim. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. Additionally, filing attorney incorrectly selected 'Police Department' as a filers. Per the pleading, the correct filer is only New Orleans City. No further action is necessary. (mp)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by New Orleans City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Erica A. Therio added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft).(Therio, Erica) Modified text/filers on 6/26/2019 (mp).
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Police Department(8th District) served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (ajn)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City, Police Department(7th District), and Police Department(6th District) were served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Rtn Executed, #2 Summons Rtn Executed)(ajn)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susie Morgan recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/15/19.(sbs)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to New Orleans City, Police Department(7th District), Police Department(6th District), Police Department(8th District). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Pauper Letter)(cg)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 5/15/2019. (cg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2019: #1 Pauper Letter) (cg).
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Whiticar. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (sbs)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Orleans City, Police Department filed by Mark Whiticar. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sbs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whiticar v. New Orleans City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Churita H. Hansell
Represented By: Sunni Jones LeBeouf
Represented By: Erica A. Therio
Represented By: Donesia Diane Turner
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Whiticar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?