Guillory v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jean Guillory
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv10368
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Simmons, Avery)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.Attorney Avery Ann Simmons added to party Lincoln National Life Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Simmons, Avery)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Toledano, Reagan)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (sa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7642575) filed by Jean Guillory. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney Reagan Levert Toledano added to party Jean Guillory(pty:pla).(Toledano, Reagan) Modified text on 5/15/2019 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guillory v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Avery Ann Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Guillory
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Represented By: James Frederick Willeford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?