Ruffin v. Larpenter et al

Plaintiff: Lee A. Ruffin
Defendant: Steve Bergeron, Jerry Larpenter and Gordon Dove
Case Number: 2:2019cv10378
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #8 Objection to Report and Recommendations. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 7/29/2019. (mp)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 DEFICIENT: OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Lee A. Ruffin (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(mp)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT: ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and/or for failing to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 6/19/2019.(blg)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #4 ; ORDERED that plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and/or for failing to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 6/19/2019.(blg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Objections to R&R due by 6/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 5/28/2019.(cg)(cc: Judge Africk)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $4.08 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Lee A. Ruffin in monthly payments as set out in document. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is DIRECTED to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 5/20/2019. (cc: Warden)(caa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lee A. Ruffin. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (sbs)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steve Bergeron, Gordon Dove, Jerry Larpenter filed by Lee A. Ruffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sbs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruffin v. Larpenter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Larpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee A. Ruffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?