Jung L.L.C. v. Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: The Jung L.L.C. and Jung, LLC
Defendant: Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company and Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv10462
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 07/02/2019.(am)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: 19-10462 is hereby CONSOLIDATED with 18-1380. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all documents hereafter, including those referring to the member case, shall bear the caption of the lead case (18-1380) together with the docket number(s) of all cases within the consolidation (as shown above). A separate notation should also be in the heading of each document listing as to which case(s) the pleading applies to, or the notation "ALL CASES" if it applies to all cases.. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/21/2019.(ecm)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. as related to 18-1380. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (NEF: JCW, JVM)(ecm)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lexington Insurance Company, Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Related Case(s) Notice of Collateral Proceeding by The Jung L.L.C. of related case(s) 18-cv-1380, c/w 19-2227, c/w 19-2230. (Garner, James)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Lexington Insurance Company, Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7646440) filed by Jung L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) Attorney James M. Garner added to party Jung L.L.C.(pty:pla).(Garner, James) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jung L.L.C. v. Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Jung L.L.C.
Represented By: James M. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jung, LLC
Represented By: Peter L. Hilbert, Jr.
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Darnell Bludworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?