Chauvin v. Symetra Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mary Beth Chauvin
Defendant: Symetra Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv10493
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Symetra Life Insurance Company on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Pellegrin, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Symetra Life Insurance Company. (jeg)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Symetra Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7648109) filed by Mary Beth Chauvin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney David C. Pellegrin added to party Mary Beth Chauvin(pty:selreq).(Pellegrin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chauvin v. Symetra Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symetra Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Beth Chauvin
Represented By: David C. Pellegrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?