Licona v. Vannoy et al
Plaintiff: Jose M. Licona
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2019cv10502
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), by Darrel Vannoy.Attorney Gail Denise Schlosser added to party Darrel Vannoy(pty:dft).(Schlosser, Gail)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service of H/C Response Order served on 24th JDC Clerk on 6/5/2019; Served on Attorney General's Office on 6/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green Card - Attorney General's Office)(mm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service of Certified Receipt on Habeas Corpus Response Order served on District Attorney, Jefferson Parish on 6/5/2019. (sa)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for Jefferson Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 6/3/2019.(cg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2019: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Number to Jefferson Parish DA, Clerk of Jefferson Parish and LA DOJ Attorney General) (cg).
May 31, 2019 Filing fee paid from Jose M. Licona re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), (Filing fee $ 5) (sa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Jose M. Licona.(sbs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2019: #1 Original Deficient Petition - Part One, #2 Part Two, #3 Part Three, #4 Part Four, #5 Part Five, #6 Part Six, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (sa).
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 6/10/2019. (sa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 *DEFICIENT* PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Jose M. Licona. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 6, #2 Part 3 of 6, #3 Part 4 of 6, #4 Part 5 of 6, #5 Part 6 of 6, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(sa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Licona v. Vannoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Represented By: Gail Denise Schlosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Licona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?