Smith v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn S Smith
Defendant: Kinder Morgan, Inc., el paso corporation retiree benefits plan, The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv10612
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Danielle M. Schroder. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 05/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susie Morgan recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/23/2019.(sbs)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to El Paso Corporation Retiree Benefits Plan, Kinder Morgan, Inc., Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sbs)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Wanko, D.)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Danielle M. Schroder (Filing fee $100 receipt number 053L-7657465) by Carolyn S Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 ECF Registration)(Wanko, D.) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (sbs).
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7657408) filed by Carolyn S Smith. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) Attorney D. Steven Wanko, Jr added to party Carolyn S Smith(pty:pla).(Wanko, D.) (Attachments 1-3 replaced on 5/22/2019) (sbs). Modified text on 5/22/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn S Smith
Represented By: D. Steven Wanko, Jr
Represented By: Danielle M. Schroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: el paso corporation retiree benefits plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?