Bondurant v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Terry L Bondurant
Defendant: One Beacon Insurance Company, Hercules Inc., McCarty Corporation, 3M Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Century Indemnity Company, General Electric Company, Gould Electronics, Inc. and Certain Underwriters LLoyd's London
Case Number: 2:2019cv10693
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, by Anco Insulation, Inc..Attorney Margaret M. Joffe added to party Anco Insulation, Inc. (pty:dft).(Joffe, Margaret)
July 19, 2019 Filing 35 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Anco Insulation, Inc. (Joffe, Margaret)
July 18, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by CanadianOxy Offshore Production Co..(Spears, Kenneth)
July 18, 2019 Filing 33 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CanadianOxy Offshore Production Co. Corporate Parents are Nexen Holdings U.S.A., Nexen Energy ULC, CNOOC Limited, The Peoples Republic of China, China National Offshore Oil Corporation (Spears, Kenneth) Modified corporate parents on 7/19/2019 (cg).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER & REASONS. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #18 Motion to Remand is DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
July 16, 2019 Filing 31 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Eastman Kodak Company. Corporate Parents are Blackstone Group, LP and GSO Capital Partners LP for Eastman Kodak Company (Pugh, Lawrence) Modified corporate parents on 7/17/2019 (cg).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDERED that oral argument on Plaintiff's #18 Motion to Remand set for July 17, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. The Motion will be considered on the briefs unless the Court instructs the parties otherwise. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Bridget B. Truxillo for Terry L Bondurant. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 7/15/2019. (cg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 28 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Terry L Bondurant. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cheek, Lindsey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CBS Corporation re #18 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court . (McCoy, Lacey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by General Electric Company re #18 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court . (McCoy, Lacey) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (cg).
July 9, 2019 Filing 25 FILED IN ERROR--SEE REC DOC. 26--RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by General Electric Company re #18 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court . (McCoy, Lacey) Modified on 7/10/2019 (cg).
July 9, 2019 Filing 24 FILED IN ERROR--SEE REC DOC. 27---RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CBS Corporation re #18 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court . (McCoy, Lacey) Modified on 7/10/2019 (cg).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear for Attorney Lawrence G. Pugh, III,Juan Jose Miranda for Eastman Kodak Company. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/28/2019. (cg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear as Counsel of Record for LAWRENCE G. PUGH, III and JUAN J. MIRANDA by Eastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wolfson, Jonathan)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #17 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. The Motion is GRANTED with respect to Kenneth R. Spears and Jeffery D. Fruge of the law firm of Spears & Gary, L.L.C., and IT IS ORDERED that Kenneth R. Spears and Jeffery D. Fruge be enrolled as counsel of record for CANADIANOXY OFFSHORE PRODUCTION COMPANY. The Motion is DENIED with respect to Claudia H. Gary on the basis that her license has been suspended for failure to pay dues. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/25/2019. (cg)
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Clerk re #19 Request/Statement of Oral Argument re #18 MOTION to Remand. Pursuant to Local Rule 78.1, this motion is set for hearing with oral argument on 7/17/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Carl J. Barbier. (cg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Terry L Bondurant regarding #18 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court (Cheek, Lindsey)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Terry L Bondurant. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Notice of Submission)(Cheek, Lindsey)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by CanadianOxy Offshore Production Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jeffery D. Fruge added to party CanadianOxy Offshore Production Co.(pty:dft).(Fruge, Jeffery)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman,Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux,Michael D. Goggans,Meghan B. Senter,Vikram S. Bhatia for Hercules, LLC. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/20/2019. (cg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Compliance Supplement by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(McCoy, Lacey)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Hercules, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hays, Bradley)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Jeanette S. Riggins, Christopher O. Massenburg, Bradley Adam Hays, Michael D. Goggans, Meghan B. Senter for Eaton Corporation. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/12/2019. (gec)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jeanette Seraile-Riggins added to party Eaton Corporation(pty:dft).(Seraile-Riggins, Jeanette)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 DEFICIENT: NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Adam Hays on behalf of Hercules, LLC. Attorney Bradley Adam Hays added to party Hercules, LLC(pty:dft).(Hays, Bradley) Modified on 6/11/2019 (cg).
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Schneider Electric SE, Corporate Parent Electric Holding Amerique du Nord, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Industries, SAS for Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Strain, Stacey)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION for Joinder. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Statement. Clerk took corrective action. (gec)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint PFD by CBS Corporation.(Hainkel, John) Modified link on 5/30/2019 (cg).
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. The statement of Corporate Disclosure should have been a separate filing. Clerk took corrective action and filed it separately. No further action is necessary. (cg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc., Corporate Parent GAMCO Investors, Inc. for CBS Corporation (Hainkel, John)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Statement re Joinder in Notice of Removal by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Proposed Order)Attorney John Joseph Hainkel, III added to party CBS Corporation(pty:dft).(Hainkel, John) Modified on 5/29/2019 (gec).
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by One Beacon Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Lamorak Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited for One Beacon Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (cg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-2411 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7665866) filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Compliance, #3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I)Attorney John Joseph Hainkel, III added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft).(Hainkel, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bondurant v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Beacon Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hercules Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By:
Represented By:
Represented By:
Represented By:
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Indemnity Company
Represented By:
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By:
Represented By:
Represented By:
Represented By:
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters LLoyd's London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry L Bondurant
Represented By:
Represented By:
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?