Hof vs LaPorte, et al
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Hof
Defendant: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company and LaPorte, A Professional Accounting Corporation
In Re: Foodservicewarehouse.com, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv10696
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
2 Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Stephen L. Miles added to party Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Miles, Stephen)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #4 Motion to Transfer Case. On June 27, 2019, the related case, Pride Centric Resources, Inc. v. LaPorte, et al., Civ. A. No. 19-10163-WBV-JVM, was transferred from Section L to Section D. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 7/23/2019. (jeg)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Continental Casualty Company, LaPorte, A Professional Accounting Corporation of Consent to #4 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Duplantier, Richard) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (jeg).
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Trustee's Original Complaint with Jury Demand by LaPorte, A Professional Accounting Corporation. Attorney Richard G. Duplantier, Jr added to party LaPorte, A Professional Accounting Corporation(pty:dft).(Duplantier, Richard) Modified text on 6/28/2019 (jeg).
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Turstee's Original Complaint with Jury Demand by Continental Casualty Company. Attorney Richard G. Duplantier, Jr added to party Continental Casualty Company(pty:dft).(Duplantier, Richard) Modified text on 6/28/2019 (jeg).
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Transfer Case by Ronald J. Hof. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bendana, Alicia)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/3/2019.(ajn)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference without prejudice to the defendants right to challenge the propriety of this Order once they are served. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 6/3/2019. (ajn)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Ronald J. Hof. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, #4 Transmittal Letter, #5 Docket Sheet, #6 Voluntary Petition)(ajn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hof vs LaPorte, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen L. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Blake W. Bourgeois
Represented By: Richard G. Duplantier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaPorte, A Professional Accounting Corporation
Represented By: Blake W. Bourgeois
Represented By: Richard G. Duplantier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Hof
Represented By: Mark Samuel Goldstein
Represented By: Michael Richard Allweiss
Represented By: Alicia Martone Bendana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Foodservicewarehouse.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?